This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2021 at 08:32:28 (UTC).

Buckley v. Gish Logging, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Buckley filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Gish Logging, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvette Kane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01820

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvette Kane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guy Buckley

Defendant

Gish Logging, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin D. Salvina

Attorney at Murphy Law Group, LLC

1628 Jfk Blvd.Ste 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael P Murphy

Attorney at Murphy Law Group, LLC

1628 John F. Kennedy Boulevardsuite 1803

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

David Dagle

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter J Russo, P.C.

245 Grandview Avesuite 102

Camp Hill, PA 17011

Megan D Strait

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter J. Russo, P.C.

245 Grandview Avenuesuite 102

Camp Hill, PA 17011

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Gish Logging, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5735590), filed by Guy Buckley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rw) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Gish Logging, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

2 #1

Summons Packet

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P Murphy on behalf of Guy Buckley (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#4

(#4) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/27/21. (dmn) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Guy Buckley. Gish Logging, Inc. waiver sent on 10/26/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by David Dagle on behalf of Gish Logging, Inc.. (Dagle, David) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Gish Logging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dagle, David) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan D Strait on behalf of Gish Logging, Inc.. (Strait, Megan) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Gish Logging, Inc.. (Strait, Megan) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Defendant shall have until January 14, 2022, to file an Answer. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/23/21. (dmn) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Defendant shall have until January 14, 2022, to file an Answer. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/23/21. (dmn) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Gish Logging, Inc.. (Strait, Megan) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan D Strait on behalf of Gish Logging, Inc.. (Strait, Megan) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Gish Logging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dagle, David) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by David Dagle on behalf of Gish Logging, Inc.. (Dagle, David) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Guy Buckley. Gish Logging, Inc. waiver sent on 10/26/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/27/21. (dmn) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P Murphy on behalf of Guy Buckley (Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Gish Logging, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Gish Logging, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5735590), filed by Guy Buckley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rw) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less