This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:39:20 (UTC).

Buckenberger v. Vannoy et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Buckenberger filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Vannoy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Dana Douglas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14458

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Buckenberger

Angola, LA 70712

Defendant

Darryl Vannoy

Respondent

Attorney General State of Louisiana

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 12/16/2019. (cg) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Amend #6 MOTION for Documents at the Government's Expense by Christopher Buckenberger. (ajn) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

4 #1

Letter

#2

(#2) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Buckenberger. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (clw) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Christopher Buckenberger. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(clw) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ORDER Granting #6 and #7 Motions for Documents. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/14/2020. (ajn) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#5

(#5) USCA Letter to Christopher Buckenberger dated 12/18/2019. (ajn) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

1 #1

Memorandum in Support

#6

(#6) MOTION for Documents at the Government's Expense by Christopher Buckenberger. (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER transferring petition to U.S. Court of Appeals - 5th Circuit to determine if petitioner is allowed to file successive habeas petition in this court. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(ajn) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting #6 and #7 Motions for Documents. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/14/2020. (ajn) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Amend #6 MOTION for Documents at the Government's Expense by Christopher Buckenberger. (ajn) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Documents at the Government's Expense by Christopher Buckenberger. (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) USCA Letter to Christopher Buckenberger dated 12/18/2019. (ajn) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER transferring petition to U.S. Court of Appeals - 5th Circuit to determine if petitioner is allowed to file successive habeas petition in this court. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(ajn) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 12/16/2019. (cg) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Buckenberger. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (clw) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Christopher Buckenberger. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(clw) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.