This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/26/2019 at 07:32:56 (UTC).

Buck et al v. Baus et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Buck filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Baus. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly K.E. Mahoney and Linda R Reade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02042

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly K.E. Mahoney

Presiding Judge

Linda R Reade

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Amy Buck

Ian Buck

Eric Buck

Jonas Buck

Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Cross Claimants

John Baus

Schneider National Carriers, Inc

Schneider National, Inc

Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc

USAA Casualty Insurance Company

3Rd Party Defendants

Aaron Lee Barfels

Kyle Anthony Ralston

Jeremy Allen Schmidt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Timothy S Semelroth

Attorney at RSH Legal, PC

425 - 2Nd Street Se, Suite 1140, ***Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401-1818

Brian C Ivers

Attorney at RHS Legal PC

425 Second Street Se, Suite 1140, ***Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

Pressley Wade Henningsen

Attorney at RSH Legal P.C.

425 2Nd St Se, Suite 1140, ***Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

Benjamin Philip Long

Attorney at RSH Legal P.C.

425 Second Street Se, Suite 1140, ***Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

Brian L Yung

Attorney at Klass Law Firm LLP

4280 Sergeant Road Suite 290, Ecf

Sioux City, IA 51106

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Cross Claimant Attorney

Dennis P Ogden

Attorney at Brick Gentry PC

6701 Westown Parkway, Suite 100, Ecf

West Des Moines, IA 50266

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Timothy W Hamann

Attorney at Clark Butler Walsh & Hamann

10 W Fourth Street, Po Box 596, Ecf

Waterloo, IA 50704-0596

Joshua Lloyd Christensen

Attorney at Clark Butler Walsh & Hamann

315 E 5Th Street, Po Box 596, Ecf

Waterloo, IA 50704

Jessica Lee McNamara

Attorney at Fuerste Carew Coyle Juergens & Sudmeier PC

890 Main Street, Suite 200, ***Ecf

Dubuque, IA 52001

Douglas M Henry

Attorney at Fuerste Carew Juergens & Sudmeier PC

151 West 8Th Street, Security Building, Suite 200, Ecf

Dubuque, IA 52001

Jenny L Weiss

Attorney at Fuerste Carew Juergens & Sudmeier PC

151 W 8Th Street, Suite 200, ***Ecf

Dubuque, IA 52001

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) STATEMENT of No Resistance by Jeremy Allen Schmidt re #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Scheduling Requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) and LR 81(b) in Removed Action (Henry, Douglas) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (des) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ANSWER With Jury Demand to Crossclaim by Eric Buck, Ian Buck.(Yung, Brian) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER granting #19 Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Scheduling Requirements. The deadline for submission of a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan is extended to 9/25/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 8/15/2019. (mmc) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ANSWER to #8 Third Party Complaint by Aaron Lee Barfels.(Hamann, Timothy) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Appearance of Douglas M. Henry, Jenny L. Weiss, and Jessica L. McNamara for Jeremy Allen Schmidt.(Henry, Douglas) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (kms). Modified text on 8/20/2019 (jjh). (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Jeremy Allen Schmidt (Henry, Douglas) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ANSWER to #8 Third Party Complaint by Jeremy Allen Schmidt.(Henry, Douglas) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Scheduling Requirements by Defendant Schneider National Carriers, Inc (Ogden, Dennis) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (kms). (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. Kyle Anthony Ralston served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Ogden, Dennis) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #15 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Aaron Lee Barfels: Responsive pleading due 8/23/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 8/6/2019. (jjh) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) THIRD Party Complaint With Jury Demand against Kyle Anthony Ralston, Jeremy Allen Schmidt, Aaron Lee Barfels, filed by John Baus, Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Ogden, Dennis) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Schneider National Carriers, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National Inc. for Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Ogden, Dennis) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DEFENDANTS' Answer With Jury Demand to Complaint of Plaintiffs' and Crossclaim against Eric Buck, Ian Buck by Schneider National Carriers, Inc, John Baus.(Ogden, Dennis) Modified on 7/5/2019 to edit text (src) Modified parties in docket text on 7/24/2019 (des) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Set Deadlines: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/19/2019. (kms) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCKET Annotation : Please find the Civil Removal Actions New Case Packet attached. (kms) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Schneider National, Inc, Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc, and USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (kms) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATE Court Petition Jury Demand by Amy Buck, Eric Buck, Ian Buck, Jonas Buck. (kms) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 7/29/2019. (kms) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked, none found. (kms) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from IOWA DISTRICT COURT FOR BLACK HAWK COUNTY, case number LACV137250. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2970163), filed by JOHN BAUS. Scheduling Report due by 8/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Ogden, Dennis) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schneider National, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Schneider National Bulk Carriers, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant