This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:15:36 (UTC).

Buchholz v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Buchholz filed an Other lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-60163

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward Buchholz

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Trans Union, LLC

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Comenity, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas John Patti, III

Attorney at Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 S.E. 6Th Street, Suite 1700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Jibrael Jarallah Said Hindi

Attorney at The Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 Se 6Th St., 17Th Floor

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

Graziella Michelle Pastor

Attorney at Jones Day

495 Brickell Ave, Apt. 2111

Miami, FL 33131

Jason Daniel Joffe

Attorney at Squire Sanders & Dempsey LLP

200 S Biscayne Boulevard, 40Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131-2398

Alexandria N Epps

Attorney at Quilling SElander Lownds Winslett and Moser

6900 North Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

Cory William Eichhorn

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

701 Brickell Avenue, Suite 3300

Miami, FL 33131

Charles James McHale, Jr.

Attorney at Golden Scaz Gagain, PLLC

201 North Armenia Avenue

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. (Epps, Alexandria) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#26

(#26) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland Credit Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Eichhorn, Cory) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#25

(#25) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Eichhorn, Cory) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

23 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed order

23 #23

Main Document

#22

(#22) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Edward Buchholz (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Striking #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

17 #17

Main Document

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed order

#6

(#6) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Comenity, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. (jas) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

1 #6

Summon(s)

1 #5

Summon(s)

1 #4

Summon(s)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. (Epps, Alexandria) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland Credit Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Eichhorn, Cory) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Eichhorn, Cory) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Midland Credit Management, Inc.'s Response/Answer due 3/16/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/3/2022. (eca) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, 21 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Second) by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Eichhorn, Cory) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Edward Buchholz (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Midland Credit Management, Inc's Response/Answer due 3/2/2022.PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Trans Union, LLC's Response/Answer due 3/17/2022.PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Equifax Information Services, LLC 's Response/Answer due 4/4/2022. PAPERLESS ORDER striking #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document per Notice of Striking #20 . Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/16/2022. (eca) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Striking #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX INC for Equifax Information Services, LLC (Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Response/Answer due 3/24/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/10/2022. (eca) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pastor, Graziella) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Pastor, Graziella) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Graziella Michelle Pastor on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Graziella Michelle Pastor added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (pty:dft). (Pastor, Graziella) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • Docket(#5) PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/25/2022. (eca) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/25/2022. (eca) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Comenity, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. (jas) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15337346, filed by Edward Buchholz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Comenity Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant