This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2020 at 07:40:04 (UTC).

BUCHANNON v. ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 BUCHANNON filed an Other lawsuit against ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN C WINSOR and MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00402

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLEN C WINSOR

Referral Judge

MARTIN A FITZPATRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOBLE T. BUCHANNON

Defendant

ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN LAMAR PONDER

Attorney at BRIAN PONDER LLP - NEW YORK NY

200 Park Ave, Ste 1700

New York, NY 10166

Defendant Attorney

LAUREN MARSHALL BURNETTE

Attorney at MESSER STRICKLER LTD - JACKSONVILLE FL

12276 San Jose Boulevard, Suite 718

Jacksonville, FL 32223

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Exhibit A - Defendant's FL SOS filings 2000-2020 (public record)

#12

(#12) FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC OPPORTUNITY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's FL SOS filings 2000-2020 (public record)) (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 10/5/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER STRIKING #9 AMENDED COMPLAINT, GRANTING #6 MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, AND ORDERING RESPONSE TO #5 MOTION TO DISMISS. The motion for judicial notice, ECF No. #6 , is GRANTED. The first amended complaint, ECF No. #9 , is STRICKEN as unauthorized. Plaintiff must file a response to the motion to dismiss no later than 10/2/2020. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/28/2020. (rcb) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#10

(#10) OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 9/28/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 09/26/2020)

9 #2

Exhibit B -Redacted copy of the letter sent by Plaintiff, on or about April 209,

9 #1

Exhibit A - Defendant's FL SOS filings 2000-2020

#9

(#9) ***STRICKEN PER ECF #11 ** AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's FL SOS filings 2000-2020, #2 Exhibit B -Redacted copy of the letter sent by Plaintiff, on or about April 209, 2020, to Defendant) (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title & link ECF #11 on 9/28/2020 (rcb). . (Entered: 09/26/2020)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 9/28/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 09/26/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/18/20. Plaintiff must file responses to #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and #6 Motion for Judicial Notice by 9/25/2020. (tss) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Letter

#6

(#6) DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter) (BURNETTE, LAUREN) Modified to edit title on 9/1/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit A - Letter

#5

(#5) DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(2) WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter) (BURNETTE, LAUREN) Modified to edit title on 9/1/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#4

(#4) Return of Service served on Defendant Associated Credit Services, Inc. on August 11, 2020, filed by NOBLE T. BUCHANNON. (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 9/1/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC.. (rcb) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

2 #1

SUMMONS FOR ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC.

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS FOR ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC.) (PONDER, BRIAN) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Staff Notes (Email on 9/2/2020) (rcb)**An ISO is needed** (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC OPPORTUNITY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's FL SOS filings 2000-2020 (public record)) (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 10/5/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER STRIKING #9 AMENDED COMPLAINT, GRANTING #6 MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, AND ORDERING RESPONSE TO #5 MOTION TO DISMISS. The motion for judicial notice, ECF No. #6 , is GRANTED. The first amended complaint, ECF No. #9 , is STRICKEN as unauthorized. Plaintiff must file a response to the motion to dismiss no later than 10/2/2020. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/28/2020. (rcb) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 9/28/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 09/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***STRICKEN PER ECF #11 ** AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's FL SOS filings 2000-2020, #2 Exhibit B -Redacted copy of the letter sent by Plaintiff, on or about April 209, 2020, to Defendant) (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title & link ECF #11 on 9/28/2020 (rcb). . (Entered: 09/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 9/28/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 09/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/18/20. Plaintiff must file responses to #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and #6 Motion for Judicial Notice by 9/25/2020. (tss) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter) (BURNETTE, LAUREN) Modified to edit title on 9/1/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(2) WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter) (BURNETTE, LAUREN) Modified to edit title on 9/1/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service served on Defendant Associated Credit Services, Inc. on August 11, 2020, filed by NOBLE T. BUCHANNON. (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 9/1/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC.. (rcb) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS FOR ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC.) (PONDER, BRIAN) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against ASSOCIATED CREDIT SERVICES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5570301.), filed by NOBLE T. BUCHANNON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (PONDER, BRIAN) Modified to edit title on 8/10/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less