This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2020 at 11:24:40 (UTC).

Buchanan v. State of Oklahoma et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Buchanan filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State of Oklahoma. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shon T. Erwin and Bernard Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00964

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shon T. Erwin

Presiding Judge

Bernard Jones

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mark Wesley Buchanan

Respondents

State of Oklahoma

County of Oklahoma

Oklahoma Department of Corrections

Oklahoma State Legislature

Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board

Oklahoma City Police Department

 

Court Documents

#9

8 #1

Envelope

#8

#7

6 #2

Envelope

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - Numbers for Paupers Affidavit

#6

5 #3

Envelope

5 #2

Attachment 2 - Brief in Support

5 #1

Attachment 1 - Letter

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Envelope

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ~ The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation #7 , DENIES Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #6 , and ORDERS Petitioner to pay the $5.00 filing fee in full within twenty-one days, or no later than December 7, 2020. Petitioner is advised that if he does not pay the full $5.00 filing fee on or before that date, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 11/16/2020. (dwl) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE (other) titled "In Re: To Payment of Filing Fees" by Mark Wesley Buchanan (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that Petitioner's Motion ECF No. #6 be DENIED and that he be ordered to prepay the full $5.00 filing fee for this action to proceed. This report and recommendation terminates the referral to the undersigned magistrate judge unless and until the matter is re-referred. Objections to R&R due by 11/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 10/15/2020. (mc) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Wesley Buchanan. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Numbers for Paupers Affidavit, #2 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Amended) filed by Mark Wesley Buchanan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter, #2 Attachment 2 - Brief in Support, #3 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO PETITIONER TO CURE DEFICIENCY -- The Court is in receipt of the documents Petitioner tendered in the referenced matter. However, the documents are deficient in the area(s) indicated. Petitioner shall cure the deficiencies designated by October 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/25/2020(mc) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 09/25/20. (knt) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PREVIOUS Cases. (knt) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mark Wesley Buchanan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less