5:20-CV-00964
09/24/2020
Pending - Other Pending
Prisoner - Other Prisoner
Shon T. Erwin
Bernard Jones
Mark Wesley Buchanan
State of Oklahoma
County of Oklahoma
Oklahoma Department of Corrections
Oklahoma State Legislature
Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board
Oklahoma City Police Department
Envelope
Envelope
Exhibit 1 - Numbers for Paupers Affidavit
Envelope
Attachment 2 - Brief in Support
Attachment 1 - Letter
Envelope
Docket(#9) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ~ The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation #7 , DENIES Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #6 , and ORDERS Petitioner to pay the $5.00 filing fee in full within twenty-one days, or no later than December 7, 2020. Petitioner is advised that if he does not pay the full $5.00 filing fee on or before that date, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 11/16/2020. (dwl) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) NOTICE (other) titled "In Re: To Payment of Filing Fees" by Mark Wesley Buchanan (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
[-] Read LessDocketMagistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that Petitioner's Motion ECF No. #6 be DENIED and that he be ordered to prepay the full $5.00 filing fee for this action to proceed. This report and recommendation terminates the referral to the undersigned magistrate judge unless and until the matter is re-referred. Objections to R&R due by 11/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 10/15/2020. (mc) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Wesley Buchanan. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Numbers for Paupers Affidavit, #2 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Amended) filed by Mark Wesley Buchanan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter, #2 Attachment 2 - Brief in Support, #3 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) ORDER TO PETITIONER TO CURE DEFICIENCY -- The Court is in receipt of the documents Petitioner tendered in the referenced matter. However, the documents are deficient in the area(s) indicated. Petitioner shall cure the deficiencies designated by October 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/25/2020(mc) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 09/25/20. (knt) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) PREVIOUS Cases. (knt) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mark Wesley Buchanan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
[-] Read Less