This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2021 at 08:18:49 (UTC).

Buchanan v. Maye et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Buchanan filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Maye. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are D. P. Marshall Jr. and Beth Deere. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00013

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

Referral Judge

Beth Deere

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Buchanan

Marianna, AR 72360

Defendants

Bobby Maye

Larry Jones

Jonnie Jones

Austin

Doe

Marty

Quinn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Dugger

Attorney at Association of Arkansas Counties

1415 West Third

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Jonnie Jones served on 3/17/2021. (bmd) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Austin, Jonnie Jones, Larry Jones, Marty, Bobby Maye.(Dugger, Melissa) (Docket text modified on 3/26/2021 to remove duplicate text) (jak) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Dugger on behalf of Austin, Jonnie Jones, Larry Jones, Marty, Bobby Maye (Dugger, Melissa) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Christopher Buchanan. (llg) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#14

(#14) ADDENDUM to #13 Amended Complaint filed by Christopher Buchanan. (llg) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#13

(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Buchanan.(kdr) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER denying as moot #11 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/10/2021. (jak) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Extend Time by Christopher Buchanan. (ljb) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) MOTION to Extend Time by Christopher Buchanan. (ljb) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Christopher Buchanan. (ljb) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Buchanan. (ljb) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#6

(#6) PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that Mr. Buchanan's First Amendment and equal protection claims be dismissed, without prejudice, based on a failure to state a claim for relief. Mr. Buchanan's negligence claims against Defendants should be dismissed with prejudice. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/9/2021. (csf) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summonses for Defendants Bobby Maye, Larry Jones, Jonnie Jones, Officer Marty, and Officer Austin; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the Defendants with summonses and copies of the #2 Complaint, with any attachments, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security; denying #3 motion for order; and instructing the Clerk to add Officer Marty and Officer Austin as party Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/9/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the East Arkansas Regional Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/9/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#3

(#5) ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summonses for Defendants Bobby Maye, Larry Jones, Jonnie Jones, Officer Marty, and Officer Austin; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the Defendants with summonses and copies of the #2 Complaint, with any attachments, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security; denying #3 motion for order; and instructing the Clerk to add Officer Marty and Officer Austin as party Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/9/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#2

(#17) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Austin, Jonnie Jones, Larry Jones, Marty, Bobby Maye.(Dugger, Melissa) (Docket text modified on 3/26/2021 to remove duplicate text) (jak) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#1

(#4) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the East Arkansas Regional Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/9/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Jonnie Jones served on 3/17/2021. (bmd) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Austin served on 3/17/2021. (bmd) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #17 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Austin, Jonnie Jones, Larry Jones, Marty, Bobby Maye.(Dugger, Melissa) (Docket text modified on 3/26/2021 to remove duplicate text) (jak) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Dugger on behalf of Austin, Jonnie Jones, Larry Jones, Marty, Bobby Maye (Dugger, Melissa) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Christopher Buchanan. (llg) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ADDENDUM to #13 Amended Complaint filed by Christopher Buchanan. (llg) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Buchanan.(kdr) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER denying as moot #11 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/10/2021. (jak) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Extend Time by Christopher Buchanan. (ljb) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Extend Time by Christopher Buchanan. (ljb) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Christopher Buchanan. (ljb) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Buchanan. (ljb) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that Mr. Buchanan's First Amendment and equal protection claims be dismissed, without prejudice, based on a failure to state a claim for relief. Mr. Buchanan's negligence claims against Defendants should be dismissed with prejudice. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/9/2021. (csf) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summonses for Defendants Bobby Maye, Larry Jones, Jonnie Jones, Officer Marty, and Officer Austin; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the Defendants with summonses and copies of the #2 Complaint, with any attachments, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security; denying #3 motion for order; and instructing the Clerk to add Officer Marty and Officer Austin as party Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/9/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the East Arkansas Regional Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/9/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Order by Christopher Buchanan. (llg) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Christopher Buchanan. (llg) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Buchanan. (llg) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marty is a litigant

Latest cases where AUSTIN CO is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINN COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP., is a litigant