This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/12/2021 at 15:57:23 (UTC).

Bryson v. Rowe et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Bryson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Rowe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brett Ludwig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00467

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brett Ludwig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Delorean L Bryson

Green Bay, WI 54307-9033

Defendants

John and Jane Does

Barber

Lt Hodel

Rowe

G4S

Jane Doe

John Does

Sgt Barber

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions

Milwaukee County - 550, 555, 2241

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketINITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $198.01, receipt number MK4689-4689086564. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (cmb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 5/28/21 granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The plaintiff may pay the initial partial filing fee on or before June 7, 2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(MP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to pay initial partial filing fee by Delorean L Bryson. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that on or before 5/29/21 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 198.01 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 4/29/21. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party, warden) (MP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Delorean L Bryson. (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Second NOTICE from the clerk mailed to plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Dries be signed and filed within 21 days (vkb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Delorean L Bryson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lh) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/22/2021 with signed document) (mac).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER from the clerk to Delorean Bryson re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Delorean L Bryson. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Delorean L Bryson. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rowe is a litigant

Latest cases where BARBER is a litigant