This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2020 at 11:31:13 (UTC).

BRYSIAK v. I & I SLING, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 BRYSIAK filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against I I SLING, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is CHAD F. KENNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02252

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHAD F. KENNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTHONY BRYSIAK

Defendant

I & I SLING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENJAMIN DAVID SALVINA

Attorney at Murphy Law Group

1628 Jfk Boulevard, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

AMANDA ELIZABETH STEINKE

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C

Three Parkway, 1601 Cherry Street, Suite 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19102

ANDREW LAFIURA

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

Three Parkway, 1601 Cherry St Ste 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Designation Form

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) IS SCHEDULED, VIA TELEPHONE, FOR TUESDAY, AUGUST 18, 2020 AT 9:30 A.M. BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY. IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED: THE DISCOVERY PERIOD, REGARDLESS OF ANY PENDING MOTION(S), BEGINS WITH THIS ORDER AND THE PARTIES SHALL EXCHANGE WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS IMMEDIATELY; THE PARTIES SHALL EXCHANGE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A) ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 11, 2020; AFTER CONSULTATION WITH ALL COUNSEL FOR ALL PARTIES, PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL SHALL COMPLETE AND FILE WITH THE CLERK THE REQUIRED REPORT OF THE RULE 26(F) MEETING INCORPORATING, AT A MINIMUM, ALL THE INFORMATION REQUIRED IN THIS COURTS FORM RULE 26(F) REPORT (FOUND ON THE COURTS WEBSITE) ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 13, 2020; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/8/20. 7/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, ) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by I & I SLING, INC..(LAFIURA, ANDREW) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA ELIZABETH STEINKE on behalf of I & I SLING, INC. with Certificate of Service(STEINKE, AMANDA) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW LAFIURA on behalf of I & I SLING, INC. with Certificate of Service(LAFIURA, ANDREW) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY BRYSIAK. I & I SLING, INC. waiver sent on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to I & I SLING, INC.. E-mailed To: BENJAMIN DAVID SALVINA, ESQ. on 5/13/2020 (dmc, ) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANTHONY BRYSIAK. (md, ) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against I & I SLING, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14288326.), filed by ANTHONY BRYSIAK. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(SALVINA, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMANDA ELIZABETH STEINKE