Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2020 at 04:43:19 (UTC).

Bryce et al v. Kaufax et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Bryce filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kaufax. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Tuchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01483

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sarah Beck

Brooks Bryce

Defendants

Daniel Shellum

Irwin Wierzbicki

Tyler Cascio

Marita Hoffman

Unknown Parties

Ryan Stover

Nate Jacobs

Nathan Townsend

Chandler, City of

Grace Porter-Dyson

April Kaufax

Brian Baum

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adrian Michael Paris

Attorney at Law Offices of Shawn A McMillan APC

4955 Via Lapiz

San Diego, CA 92122

Shawn Allen McMillan

Attorney at Law Offices of Shawn A McMillan APC

4955 Via Lapiz

San Diego, CA 92122

Stephen D Daner

Attorney at Law Offices of Shawn A McMillan APC

4955 Via Lapiz

San Diego, CA 92122

Defendant Attorney

James Randall Jue

Attorney at Chandler City Attorneys Office

P.O. Box 4008, Mail Stop 602

Chandler, AZ 85224-4008

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Baum, Marita Hoffman, April Kaufax, Grace Porter-Dyson: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on September 8, 2020 to Brian Baum . (Watson, Timothy) * Modified to correct date sent from 9/9/20 to 9/8/20 on 9/25/2020 (LAD). (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#14

(#14) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Baum, Marita Hoffman, April Kaufax, Grace Porter-Dyson: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on September 8, 2020 to Marita Hoffman . (Watson, Timothy) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#13

(#13) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Baum, Marita Hoffman, April Kaufax, Grace Porter-Dyson: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on September 8, 2020 to Grace Porter-Dyson . (Watson, Timothy) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#12

(#12) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Baum, Marita Hoffman, April Kaufax, Grace Porter-Dyson: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on September 8, 2020 to April Kaufax . (Watson, Timothy) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation Re Deadline for Chandler Defendants to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint (Doc. #10 ). Defendants City of Chandler, Ryan Stover, Irwin Wierzbicki, Nathan Townsend, Tyler Cascio, Nathan Jacobs, and Daniel Shellum may file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (Doc. 1) no later than November 2, 2020. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/9/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Tyler Cascio, Chandler, City of, Nate Jacobs, Daniel Shellum, Ryan Stover, Nathan Townsend, Irwin Wierzbicki. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jue, James) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James Randall Jue on behalf of Tyler Cascio, Chandler, City of, Nate Jacobs, Daniel Shellum, Ryan Stover, Nathan Townsend, Irwin Wierzbicki. (Jue, James) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

8 #5

Waiver of Service

8 #4

Waiver of Service

8 #3

Waiver of Service

8 #2

Waiver of Service

8 #1

Waiver of Service

#8

(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sarah Beck, Brooks Bryce: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 09/03/2020 to Lieutenant Daniel Shellum; Sergeant Nate Jacobs; Officer Tyler Cascio; Officer Ryan Stover; Officer Nathan Townsend; and Officer Irwin Wierzbicki . (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service, #2 Waiver of Service, #3 Waiver of Service, #4 Waiver of Service, #5 Waiver of Service)(Paris, Adrian) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#7

(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sarah Beck, Brooks Bryce: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 07/28/2020 to City of Chandler . (Paris, Adrian) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 27, 2020. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/3/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (see attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/3/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

4 #2

Summons

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Baum, Marita Hoffman, April Kaufax, Grace Porter-Dyson: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on September 8, 2020 to Brian Baum . (Watson, Timothy) * Modified to correct date sent from 9/9/20 to 9/8/20 on 9/25/2020 (LAD). (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Baum, Marita Hoffman, April Kaufax, Grace Porter-Dyson: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on September 8, 2020 to Marita Hoffman . (Watson, Timothy) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Baum, Marita Hoffman, April Kaufax, Grace Porter-Dyson: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on September 8, 2020 to Grace Porter-Dyson . (Watson, Timothy) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Baum, Marita Hoffman, April Kaufax, Grace Porter-Dyson: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on September 8, 2020 to April Kaufax . (Watson, Timothy) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation Re Deadline for Chandler Defendants to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint (Doc. #10 ). Defendants City of Chandler, Ryan Stover, Irwin Wierzbicki, Nathan Townsend, Tyler Cascio, Nathan Jacobs, and Daniel Shellum may file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (Doc. 1) no later than November 2, 2020. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/9/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Tyler Cascio, Chandler, City of, Nate Jacobs, Daniel Shellum, Ryan Stover, Nathan Townsend, Irwin Wierzbicki. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jue, James) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James Randall Jue on behalf of Tyler Cascio, Chandler, City of, Nate Jacobs, Daniel Shellum, Ryan Stover, Nathan Townsend, Irwin Wierzbicki. (Jue, James) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sarah Beck, Brooks Bryce: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 09/03/2020 to Lieutenant Daniel Shellum; Sergeant Nate Jacobs; Officer Tyler Cascio; Officer Ryan Stover; Officer Nathan Townsend; and Officer Irwin Wierzbicki . (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service, #2 Waiver of Service, #3 Waiver of Service, #4 Waiver of Service, #5 Waiver of Service)(Paris, Adrian) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sarah Beck, Brooks Bryce: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 07/28/2020 to City of Chandler . (Paris, Adrian) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Stephen D Daner on behalf of Plaintiffs Sarah Beck and Brooks Bryce. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 27, 2020. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/3/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (see attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/3/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Shawn Allen McMillan on behalf of Plaintiffs Sarah Beck, Brooks Bryce. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Brian Baum, Tyler Cascio, Chandler, City of, Marita Hoffman, Nate Jacobs, April Kaufax, Grace Porter-Dyson, Daniel Shellum, Ryan Stover, Nathan Townsend, Irwin Wierzbicki. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Sarah Beck, Brooks Bryce. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Paris, Adrian) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Adrian Michael Paris on behalf of Plaintiffs Sarah Beck, Brooks Bryce. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18509070. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01483-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18509070 filed by Brooks Bryce, Sarah Beck. (submitted by Adrian Paris) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adrian Michael Paris