This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2021 at 11:03:36 (UTC).

Bryant v. Kroger Texas, L.P.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Bryant filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kroger Texas, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa D Gilmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00080

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa D Gilmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gwen Bryant

Defendant

Kroger Texas, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Nash Todd

Attorney at The Todd Law Group PLLC

12929 Gulf Fwy., Ste 301

Houston, TX 77034

Defendant Attorneys

Adraon DelJohn Greene

Attorney at Galloway Johnson Tompkins Burr And Smith

1301 Mckinney St, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77010

Daniel David Schick

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1301 Mckinney, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kroger Texas, L.P., filed.(Schick, Daniel) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gwen Bryant, filed.(Todd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit Exh D-4

1 #7

Exhibit Exh D-3

1 #6

Exhibit Exh D-2

1 #5

Exhibit Exh D-1

1 #4

Exhibit Exh D

1 #3

Exhibit Exh C

1 #2

Exhibit Exh B

1 #1

Exhibit Exh A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2020-79324 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25785697) filed by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Exhibit Exh C, #4 Exhibit Exh D, #5 Exhibit Exh D-1, #6 Exhibit Exh D-2, #7 Exhibit Exh D-3, #8 Exhibit Exh D-4)(Greene, Adraon) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kroger Texas, L.P., filed.(Schick, Daniel) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gwen Bryant, filed.(Todd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2020-79324 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25785697) filed by Kroger Texas, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Exhibit Exh C, #4 Exhibit Exh D, #5 Exhibit Exh D-1, #6 Exhibit Exh D-2, #7 Exhibit Exh D-3, #8 Exhibit Exh D-4)(Greene, Adraon) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Nash Todd