This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2020 at 12:34:38 (UTC).

Bryant v. Gray Construction Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2020 Bryant filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Gray Construction Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karin J. Immergut. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01004

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karin J. Immergut

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katrina Bryant

Defendants

Gray Construction Inc.

Sheakley HR, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jose A. Klein

Attorney at Klein Munsinger LLC

1215 S.E. 8Th Avenue, Suite F

Portland, OR 97214-3497

Michael R. Fuller

Attorney at OlsenDaines

111 Sw 5Th Ave., Suite 3150

Portland, OR 97204

Kelly D. Jones

Attorney at Kelly D. Jones, Attorney at Law

819 Se Morrison St., Suite 255

Portland, OR 97214

Defendant Attorneys

Laura E. Rosenbaum

Attorney at Stoel Rives LLP

760 S.W. Ninth Ave., Suite 3000

Portland, OR 97205

Ryan Kunkel

Attorney at Stoel Rives LLP

760 S.W. Ninth Ave., Suite 3000

Portland, OR 97205

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

9 #2

Exhibit 1

9 #1

Proposed Summons

#9

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: The Joint Motion to Stay #11 is GRANTED. This case is STAYED for 90 days. Pursuant to this Order, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report on October 27, 2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint Motion for Stay . Filed by Gray Construction Inc.. (Kunkel, Ryan) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued Electronically as to Sheakley HR, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Amended Complaint . Filed by Katrina Bryant against Gray Construction Inc., Sheakley HR, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Exhibit 1). (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Declaration of Ryan S. Kunkel . Filed by Gray Construction Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #7 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kunkel, Ryan) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Gray Construction Inc.. (Kunkel, Ryan) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Gray Construction Inc. #4 is GRANTED. The deadline for Gray Construction Inc. to Answer or Respond to the Complaint is extended until July 14, 2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/21/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/20/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 11/20/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (sb) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Gray Construction Inc.. (Kunkel, Ryan) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Gray Construction Inc.. (Kunkel, Ryan) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration of Nathan Simon . Filed by Gray Construction Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Kunkel, Ryan) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV18587 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6878880 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Gray Construction Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Kunkel, Ryan) Modified on 6/23/2020 to correct Multnomah County Circuit Court case number (sb). (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gray Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Kunkel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura E. Rosenbaum