This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2020 at 08:48:49 (UTC).

Bryant v. Core Contents Restoration, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 Bryant filed an Other - Commerce lawsuit against Core Contents Restoration, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. Myers, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00040

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Commerce

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard E. Myers, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cathleen Bryant

Jacksonville, NC 28546

Defendants

Adriane B. Null

Yvonne D. McCormick

Nicole S. McCormick

Karen J. Koss

Core Contents Restoration, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Warren Kuhn Hicks

Attorney at Bailey & Dixon, L.L.P.

Post Office Box 1351, 434 Fayetteville Street, Suite 2500

Raleigh, NC 27602-1351

 

Court Documents

#37

36 #4

Text of Proposed Order

36 #3

Supplement Proposed Supplemental Exhibit C to Memorandum

36 #2

Supplement REDLINED Proposed Amended Memorandum in Support

36 #1

Supplement Proposed Amended Memorandum in Support

#36

32 #2

Exhibit

32 #1

Exhibit

#32

1 #19

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #18

Exhibit Q- Threat to sell

1 #17

Exhibit P- Written damage list provided

1 #13

Exhibit L- Invoice dated December 2019

1 #8

Exhibit G- Photographs that accompained January 2019 estimate

1 #7

Exhibit F- Invoice dated January 2019

1 #5

Exhibit D- Picture of Silver Forks

1 #3

Exhibit B- Vault Inventory List

1 #2

Exhibit A- Photograph of Dining Room

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMINDER TO COUNSEL regarding #36 . Pursuant to Judge Myers Practice Preferences, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of any motion, memorandum, or brief which exceeds 30 pages or of any exhibits which exceed a total of 30 pages, by mailing or delivering to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 1003 South 17th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401. The courtesy copies of any motion, memorandum, or brief and supporting exhibits which exceed a combined total of 100 pages shall be submitted in a three-ring binder. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Memorandum in Support regarding #36 Motion For Leave to File An Amended Memorandum in Support of Their #32 Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss filed by Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. (Hicks, Warren) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION For Leave to File An Amended Memorandum in Support of Their #32 Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss filed by Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Amended Memorandum in Support, #2 Supplement REDLINED Proposed Amended Memorandum in Support, #3 Supplement Proposed Supplemental Exhibit C to Memorandum, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Hicks, Warren) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/16/2020. Copy sent to Cathleen Bryant 2117 Lenox Street, Jacksonville, NC 28546 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), (7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1),(2) MOTION for More Definite Statement Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(e). Response due by 5/8/2020. Copy sent to Cathleen Bryant, 2117 Lenox Street, Jacksonville, NC 28546 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #32 Memorandum in Support. Counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit 1" is not a sufficient description). Case administrator corrected the docket text to include document descriptions for each exhibit. Counsel is reminded to comply with this rule on future filings to avoid having to refile your documents. No further action is required at this time. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. (Hicks, Warren) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Memorandum in Support regarding #31 MOTION to Dismiss Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), (7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1),(2) MOTION for More Definite Statement Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(e) filed by Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Work Authorization Agreement & Direction to Pay, #2 Exhibit 2 - Copy of Mitchell v. Walters 2010 U.S. Dist.LEXIS 93265 Opinion) (Hicks, Warren) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION to Dismiss Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), (7), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1),(2), MOTION for More Definite Statement Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(e) filed by Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hicks, Warren) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Richard E. Myers II in Wilmington: Scheduling Conference held on 4/14/2020. Counsel for the defendants were present telephonically. Plaintiff failed to appear telephonically as previously instructed. The court attempted to reach the plaintiff via telephone and was unable to do so. The hearing concluded and may be reset at a later date. (Court Reporter Risa Kramer) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; holding in abeyance #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and #4 Motion for Permanent Injunction. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff Cathleen Bryant is DIRECTED to pay to the clerk four hundred fifty (450) dollars as security, pursuant to Rule 65(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, within three (3) business days of the date of the entry of this order. It is further ORDERED that this temporary restraining order shall remain in full force and effect for fourteen (14) days from the date of the entry of this order or until the Court orders otherwise, whichever is earlier. Signed by District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 3/3/2020. Copy sent to Cathleen Bryant, 2117 Lenox Street, Jacksonville, NC 28546 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Redesignating Division. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 7:20-CV-40-M. No further filing shall be made in 4:20-CV-40-M. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/3/2020. Copy sent to Cathleen Bryant, 2117 Lenox Street, Jacksonville, NC 28546 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketRemark - This case should have been filed in the Southern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Memorandum in Support regarding #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Cathleen Bryant. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Cathleen Bryant. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Cathleen Bryant. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Self-Representation filed by Cathleen Bryant. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number NEW001074), filed by Cathleen Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit A- Photograph of Dining Room, #3 Exhibit B- Vault Inventory List, #4 Exhibit C- Box Inventory List, #5 Exhibit D- Picture of Silver Forks, #6 Exhibit E- January 2019 estimate, #7 Exhibit F- Invoice dated January 2019, #8 Exhibit G- Photographs that accompained January 2019 estimate, #9 Exhibit H- April 2019 estimate from Yvonne, #10 Exhibit I- April 2019 estimate from Nicole, #11 Exhibit J- Invoice dated April 2019 Florida, #12 Exhibit K- Invoice dated April 2019 North Carolina, #13 Exhibit L- Invoice dated December 2019, #14 Exhibit M- No arehouse receipt from Core, #15 Exhibit N- No bill of landing from Core, #16 Exhibit O- Missing items pulled for sale, #17 Exhibit P- Written damage list provided, #18 Exhibit Q- Threat to sell, #19 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less