Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2020 at 08:31:06 (UTC).

BRYANT v. C R BARD INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 BRYANT filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R BARD INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is W LOUIS SANDS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00053

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

W LOUIS SANDS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUFFY BRYANT

Defendants

C R BARD INCORPORATED

BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDREA LAYNE STACKHOUSE

Attorney at Shrader & Associates LLP

3900 Essex Lane, Ste. 390

Houston, TX 77027

STEPHEN DANIEL

225 Ottley Dr Ne, Ste 110

Atlanta, GA 30324

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARD B NORTH, JR

201 17Th St Nw Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

LUCAS ALLEN WESTBY

201 17Th St Nw Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

LEE ANN ANAND

201 17Th St Nw Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) ORDER for the parties to confer and inform the Court no later than 6/1/2020 whether they agree to conducting the 7/14/2020 scheduling/discovery conference via teleconference. The joint proposed scheduling order is due 7/7/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 5/21/2020. (sbd) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#28

(#28) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/7/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2020 03:30 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 04/14/2020. (gda) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#27

(#27) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ANDREA LAYNE STACKHOUSE (nop) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#26

(#26) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ANDREA LAYNE STACKHOUSE (nop) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

25 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#25

(#25) PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by BUFFY BRYANT Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # BGAMDC-3438026, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Stephen "Buck" Daniel Georgia Bar Number 777514. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(DANIEL, STEPHEN) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by STEPHEN DANIEL on behalf of BUFFY BRYANT Attorney STEPHEN DANIEL added to party BUFFY BRYANT(pty:pla) (DANIEL, STEPHEN) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#23

(#23) Jurisdictional Statement by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED (WESTBY, LUCAS) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#22

(#22) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED; Corporate Parent BECTON DICKINSON AND COMPANY for C R BARD INCORPORATED. (WESTBY, LUCAS) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#7

(#7) SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 03/22/2020)

#6

(#6) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD)--See document for details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SJF) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#5

(#5) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 03/13/2020)

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 01/09/2017)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Buffy Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 01/09/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13783386 filed by Buffy Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 01/09/2017)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER for the parties to confer and inform the Court no later than 6/1/2020 whether they agree to conducting the 7/14/2020 scheduling/discovery conference via teleconference. The joint proposed scheduling order is due 7/7/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 5/21/2020. (sbd) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/7/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2020 03:30 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 04/14/2020. (gda) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketREMARK: Disregard DE#27 which is a duplicate of DE#26. (nop) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ANDREA LAYNE STACKHOUSE (nop) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ANDREA LAYNE STACKHOUSE (nop) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by BUFFY BRYANT Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # BGAMDC-3438026, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Stephen "Buck" Daniel Georgia Bar Number 777514. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(DANIEL, STEPHEN) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by STEPHEN DANIEL on behalf of BUFFY BRYANT Attorney STEPHEN DANIEL added to party BUFFY BRYANT(pty:pla) (DANIEL, STEPHEN) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Jurisdictional Statement by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED (WESTBY, LUCAS) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED; Corporate Parent BECTON DICKINSON AND COMPANY for C R BARD INCORPORATED. (WESTBY, LUCAS) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LEE ANN ANAND on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED Attorney LEE ANN ANAND added to party BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED(pty:dft), Attorney LEE ANN ANAND added to party C R BARD INCORPORATED(pty:dft) (ANAND, LEE) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certified Docket Sheet (tlf). (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-00061. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.** (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketREMARK: Case Transferred to the Middle District of Georgia via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 03/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD)--See document for details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SJF) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 01/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Docket(#3) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-0061-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 01/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Buffy Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 01/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13783386 filed by Buffy Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 01/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Daniel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer A. Layne Stackhouse