This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2019 at 07:57:24 (UTC).

Bryant v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 Bryant filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Halil S. Ozerden, John C. Gargiulo and Louis Guirola, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00566

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

Presiding Judges

Halil S. Ozerden

Louis Guirola, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Bryant

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shannon L Clark

Attorney at Gallagher & Kennedy PA

2575 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Robert W Boatman

Attorney at Gallagher & Kennedy PA

2575 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9225

Paul Lincoln Stoller

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Mark Stephen O'Connor

Attorney at Beus Gilbert PLLC

701 N 44Th St.

Phoenix, AZ 85008

C Lincoln Combs

Attorney at Gallagher & Kennedy PA

2575 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9225

Shannon L Clark - PHV

Attorney at GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

2575 E. Camelback Road, Suite 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Sheila M. Bossier

Attorney at BOSSIER & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

1520 North State Street

Jackson, MS 39202

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B North, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC - Atlanta, GA

201 17Th St. Nw, Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

J. Carter Thompson, Jr.

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN, CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ, PC - Jackson

One Eastover Center, 100 Vision Drive, Suite 400, P. O. Box 14167 (39236-4167)

Jackson, MS 39211

Elizabeth Ross Hadley

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP - Austin

300 West 6Th Street, Suite 2050

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#3

#15

14 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

#4

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw. Robert W. Boatman, C. Lincoln Combs, Paul L. Stoller, and Mark S. O'Connor are terminated as counsel of record for the Plaintiff. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/31/2019 (AG) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jennifer Bryant (Clark - PHV, Shannon) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shannon Clark. Shannon Clark is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/25/2019 (AB) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) First MOTION for Shannon Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4123052) by Jennifer Bryant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bossier, Sheila) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila M. Bossier on behalf of Jennifer Bryant (Bossier, Sheila) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Attorneys Combs, O'Connor, Stoller, Boatman, and Clark have until November 4, 2019 to either file a motion to withdraw or seek pro hac vice admission. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/16/2019 (AG) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11: Attorney is advised to include the correct judge assignment of LG-JCG on future filed pleadings. This case was reassigned to District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 9/24/19. (PKS) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Carter Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Thompson, J.) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • All future filings should reflect the newly assigned Judge's initials. 1:19cv566LG-JCG. (wld) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Halil S. Ozerden recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 9/24/2019 (wld) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. Richard North, Jr. is terminated as counsel of record for the Defendants. Elizabeth Ross Hadley is substituted as counsel of record for the Defendants. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/23/2019 (AG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard North, Jr., Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Elizabeth Ross Hadley by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of All Defendants (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter sent to Robert W. Boatman, Shannon L. Clark, C. Lincoln Combs, Richard B. North, Jr., Mark Stephen O'Connor, and Paul Lincoln Stoller, on 9/11/19 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (PKS) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-01347. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Remark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.] (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.] (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-1347-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.] (Entered: 05/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12932803 filed by Jennifer Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.] (Entered: 05/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Stephen O'Connor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer C. Lincoln Combs