This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 09:51:16 (UTC).

Colton Bryant v. Albertsons LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 Colton Bryant filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Albertsons LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Autumn D. Spaeth and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00514

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLTON BRYANT

Defendants

ALBERTSON'S LLC

ABS CA-O LLC

DOES 1 to 10,

Does 1 to 10

Albertsons LLC

Albertsons LLC doing business as Albertsons No 158

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason J Kim

Attorney at So Cal Equal Access Group

101 South Western Avenue 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Jason T Yoon

Attorney at So Cal Equal Access Group

101 South Western Avenue 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Defendant Attorney

Theodore K Bell

Attorney at Safeway Inc

11555 Dublin Canyon Road

Pleasanton, CA 94588-2815

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Proof of Service

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Colton Bryant, upon Defendant ABS CA-O LLC served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020; Albertsons LLC served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 6/19/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See attached Order for details. (tg) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ABS CA-O LLC, Albertsons LLC, (Bell, Theodore) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants ABS CA-O LLC, Albertsons LLC.(Attorney Theodore K Bell added to party ABS CA-O LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Theodore K Bell added to party Albertsons LLC(pty:dft))(Bell, Theodore) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#9

(#9) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tg) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants ABS CA-O LLC, Albertsons LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff COLTON BRYANT, (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff COLTON BRYANT. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff COLTON BRYANT. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25717215 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff COLTON BRYANT. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party COLTON BRYANT(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Colton Bryant, upon Defendant ABS CA-O LLC served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020; Albertsons LLC served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 6/19/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See attached Order for details. (tg) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ABS CA-O LLC, Albertsons LLC, (Bell, Theodore) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants ABS CA-O LLC, Albertsons LLC.(Attorney Theodore K Bell added to party ABS CA-O LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Theodore K Bell added to party Albertsons LLC(pty:dft))(Bell, Theodore) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tg) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants ABS CA-O LLC, Albertsons LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff COLTON BRYANT, (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff COLTON BRYANT. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff COLTON BRYANT. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25717215 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff COLTON BRYANT. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party COLTON BRYANT(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABS CA-O LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Albertsons Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason T Yoon