This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2021 at 11:21:47 (UTC).

Bryant v. ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast, P.C. et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 Bryant filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast, P C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sherri A Lydon and Joseph Dawson, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04030

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sherri A Lydon

Joseph Dawson, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pauline Bryant

Defendants

TeamHealth doing business as ALCOA Billing Center

Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC

ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lisa Poe Davis

Attorney at Kelaher Connell and Connor

Po Drawer 14547

Surfside Beach, SC 29587

Defendant Attorneys

Victoria Therese Kepes

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

Joshua Wallace Dixon

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast, P.C., Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC, TeamHealth. Response to Motion due by 1/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Dixon, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Pauline Bryant. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Davis, Lisa) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of Chris Schmitz

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast, P.C., Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC, TeamHealth. Response to Motion due by 12/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Chris Schmitz)No proposed order.(Dixon, Joshua) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. (lgib, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#4

(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by TeamHealth.(lgib, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast, P.C.. (lgib, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-26-05881 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9482019), filed by TeamHealth, ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast, P.C., Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service) (lgib, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast, P.C., Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC, TeamHealth. Response to Motion due by 1/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Dixon, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#9) Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Joseph Dawson, III. Judge Honorable Sherri A Lydon no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss is due January 15, 2021. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 12/18/2020. (lgib, ) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Pauline Bryant. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Davis, Lisa) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast, P.C., Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC, TeamHealth. Response to Motion due by 12/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Chris Schmitz)No proposed order.(Dixon, Joshua) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. (lgib, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by TeamHealth.(lgib, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast, P.C.. (lgib, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-26-05881 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9482019), filed by TeamHealth, ACS Primary Care Physicians-Southeast, P.C., Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service) (lgib, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACS Primary Care Physicians Southwest, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHCARE REVENUE RECOVERY GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa Poe Davis