This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2020 at 08:57:07 (UTC).

Bryant et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Bryant filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela A. Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02214

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela A. Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ginger Bryant

Brian A. Bryant

Defendants

Robert A. Shepherd

John Does 1-5

John Doe Corporation 1

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Community Insurance Company

Dakota Carriers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael L. Eisner

Attorney at Elk & Elk

6105 Parkland Blvd.

Mayfield Heights, OH 44124

Defendant Attorneys

Richard P. Cuneo

Attorney at Billmaier & Cuneo

28366 Kensington Lane

Perrysburg, OH 43551

Terrence J. Kenneally

Attorney at Law Office of Terrence J. Kenneally

200 River Terrace Bldg., 19111 Detroit Road

Rocky River, OH 44116

Sean M. Kenneally

Attorney at Law Office of Terrence J. Kenneally

200 River Terrace Bldg., 19111 Detroit Road

Rocky River, OH 44116

J. Gordon Howard

Attorney at Russell, Oliver & Stephens

5178 Wheelis Drive

Memphis, TN 38117

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Order Approving Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/23/2020. (L,Ja) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#17

(#17) Joint Proposed Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue until 11/30/2020 filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc., Robert A. Shepherd. Related document(s) #12 .(Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#16

(#16) Order approving #15 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/13/2020. (L,Ja) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#15

(#15) Joint Proposed Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc., Robert A. Shepherd. Related document(s) #12 .(Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#14

(#14) Marginal Order approving #13 Joint Proposed Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/9/2020. (S,SR) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#13

(#13) Joint Proposed Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc., Robert A. Shepherd. Related document(s) #12 .(Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#12

(#12) Opposition to #8 Motion to transfer venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eisner, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#11

(#11) Answer to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's Crossclaim filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc., Robert A. Shepherd. (Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

8 #1

Proposed order to accompany motion

#8

(#12) Opposition to #8 Motion to transfer venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eisner, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Community Insurance Company. (Howard, J.) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#6

(#6) Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Community Insurance Company. (Howard, J.) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc.. (Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#4

(#4) Order: This matter was removed to this Court on September 30, 2020. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than October 14, 2020, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/1/2020. (L,Ja) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#2

(#2) Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc., Robert A. Shephert Related document(s) #1 . (Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Ex - A - Cuyahoga Complaint

#1

(#10) Answer to Initial Complaint and Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc., Robert A. Shepherd. (Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order Approving Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/23/2020. (L,Ja) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint Proposed Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue until 11/30/2020 filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc., Robert A. Shepherd. Related document(s) #12 .(Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Order approving #15 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/13/2020. (L,Ja) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint Proposed Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc., Robert A. Shepherd. Related document(s) #12 .(Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Marginal Order approving #13 Joint Proposed Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/9/2020. (S,SR) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint Proposed Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc., Robert A. Shepherd. Related document(s) #12 .(Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Opposition to #8 Motion to transfer venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eisner, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Answer to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's Crossclaim filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc., Robert A. Shepherd. (Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Defendant Dakota Carriers, Inc.'s Motion for leave to file answer instanter (Related Doc #9 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/16/2020.(L,Ja) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Answer to Initial Complaint and Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc., Robert A. Shepherd. (Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Community Insurance Company. (Howard, J.) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Community Insurance Company. (Howard, J.) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc.. (Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order: This matter was removed to this Court on September 30, 2020. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than October 14, 2020, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/1/2020. (L,Ja) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice by Clerk that Dakota Carriers, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,MI) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketJudge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Dakota Carriers, Inc., Robert A. Shephert Related document(s) #1 . (Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Common Pleas Cuyahoga County, case number CV 20 936559 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10308043. Filed by Robert A Shepherd, Dakota Carriers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cuyahoga Complaint) (Cuneo, Richard) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Community Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant