This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/18/2019 at 07:44:16 (UTC).

Bryant et al v. Monsanto Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 Bryant filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00602

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roger Bryant

Judy Bryant

Defendants

Monsanto Company

Monsanto Management Club-Nitro Plant

Does 1-50

Flexsys America Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aimee H. Wagstaff

Attorney at ANDRUS & WAGSTAFF

7171 West Alaska Drive

Lakewood, CO 80226

Marvin W. Masters

Attorney at THE MASTERS LAW FIRM

181 Summers Street

Charleston, WV 25301

Kelly Elswick-Hall

Attorney at THE MASTERS LAW FIRM

181 Summers Street

Charleston, WV 25301

Defendant Attorneys

William Montgomery Lorensen

Attorney at BOWLES RICE

P. O. Box 1386

Charleston, WV 25325-1386

Floyd E. Boone, Jr.

Attorney at BOWLES RICE

P. O. Box 1386

Charleston, WV 25325-1386

Charles M. Love, III

Attorney at BOWLES RICE

P. O. Box 1386

Charleston, WV 25325-1386

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

8 #1

Declaration of Otto J. Drescher

#8

#7

6 #3

Exhibit C

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

#5

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONFIRMATION from California Northern District that the case has been opened in that district as 3:19-cv-06395, filed 10/16/2019. (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-155) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of California transferring this action to the USDC/NDCA for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/4/2019. (cc: attys) (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-155), MDL 2741. (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) OPPOSITION by Monsanto Company in opposition to #6 MOTION by Judy Bryant, Roger Bryant to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mason County (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Boone, Floyd) (Modified on 10/3/2019 to correct party filer)(ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION REGARDING IMPROPER SERVICE ON MONSANTO MANAGEMENT CLUB - NITRO PLANT by Monsanto Company (Attachment: #1 Declaration of Otto J. Drescher)(Boone, Floyd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Judy Bryant, Roger Bryant in support of #6 MOTION by Judy Bryant, Roger Bryant to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mason County (Elswick-Hall, Kelly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Judy Bryant, Roger Bryant to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mason County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Elswick-Hall, Kelly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Flexsys America Limited.(Boone, Floyd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Monsanto Company.(Boone, Floyd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Monsanto Company (Boone, Floyd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monsanto Company with summons, complaint, declaration of David A. Woodmansee, declaration of Otto J. Drescher, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Mason County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7355833. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monsanto Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles M. Love, IV

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Floyd E. Boone, Jr.