This case was last updated from PACER on 02/22/2021 at 07:25:58 (UTC).

BRYAN v GREENWOOD MOTOR LINES INC

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 BRYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GREENWOOD MOTOR LINES INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is W LOUIS SANDS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00253

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

W LOUIS SANDS

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

Kristi Bryan

Grady Bryan,III

GRADY BRYAN, III

Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.

David Swisher

AMERICAN LIGHTING SIGNALIZATION LLC

GREENWOOD MOTOR LINES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH R PRINE, JR

577 Mulberry St Ste 110

Macon, GA 31201

Defendant Attorneys

PARKS K STONE

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Elderman & Dicker, LLP

3348 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 1400

Atlanta, GA 30326

DAVID B HALL

1500 Urban Center Dr, Ste 450

Vestavia Hills, AL 35242

LISA RENEE RICHARDSON

303 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

STEVAN A MILLER

303 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Memorandum in Support Defendant Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.'s Memorandum In

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint for Damages

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Jurisdictional Statement by AMERICAN LIGHTING SIGNALIZATION LLC (RICHARDSON, LISA) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Answer to Complaint filed by AMERICAN LIGHTING SIGNALIZATION LLC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed.(sbd) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN LIGHTING SIGNALIZATION LLC (RICHARDSON, LISA) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by AMERICAN LIGHTING SIGNALIZATION LLC with Jury Demand.(RICHARDSON, LISA)Attorney LISA RENEE RICHARDSON added to party AMERICAN LIGHTING SIGNALIZATION LLC(pty:dft) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by DAVID B HALL (nop) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by GREENWOOD MOTOR LINES INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3673835, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: 547930. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(STONE, PARKS) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 2/22/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/5/2021. (gda) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by DAVID SWISHER.(STONE, PARKS) Modified text on 1/4/2021 (sbd). (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Its Pre-Answer Motion For Partial Dismissal Under Rule 12 (b) (6) by GREENWOOD MOTOR LINES INC filed by PARKS K STONE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Defendant Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.'s Memorandum In Support of Its Pre-Answer Motion For Partial Dismissal Under Rule 12 (b) (6))(STONE, PARKS) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Jurisdictional Statement by GREENWOOD MOTOR LINES INC (STONE, PARKS) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREENWOOD MOTOR LINES INC (STONE, PARKS) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GREENWOOD MOTOR LINES INC, DAVID SWISHER ); Notice to Counsel - Joseph R. Prine - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER.(sbd) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GREENWOOD MOTOR LINES INC, DAVID SWISHER ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately.(sbd) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GREENWOOD MOTOR LINES INC, DAVID SWISHER ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(sbd) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Kristi Bryan, Grady Bryan,III Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3665203, $402 filed by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., David Swisher (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(STONE, PARKS) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., dba R+L Carriers is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Baker Hall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa R. Richardson