This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 15:32:55 (UTC).

Bryan Perez v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Bryan Perez filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Nancy A Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06236

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan Perez

San Pedro, CA 90731

Defendant

Nancy A. Berryhill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel for Social Security Adm.

Assistant US Attorney LA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

6 #2

Attachment 2 Statement

6 #1

Attachment 1

#6

(#6) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS WITH A PRO SE LITIGANT by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. *See document for details.* (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2 Statement) (es) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: Granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (es) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Social Security) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (es) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS WITH A PRO SE LITIGANT by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. *See document for details.* (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2 Statement) (es) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: Granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (es) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Bryan Perez. (car) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bryan Perez (car) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero, filed by Plaintiff Bryan Perez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (car) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less