This case was last updated from PACER on 03/30/2020 at 17:25:17 (UTC).

Brunson v. Summa Health Systems et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 Brunson filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Summa Health Systems. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Lioi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00186

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Lioi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexis Brunson

Akron, OH 44320

Defendants

Rob Crano

Summa Health Systems

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian D. Spitz

Attorney at Spitz Law Firm

25200 Chagrin Blvd.

Beachwood, OH 44122

Daniel S. Dubow

Attorney at Spitz Law Firm

25200 Chagrin Blvd.

Beachwood, OH 44122

Defendant Attorneys

W. Eric Baisden

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff - Cleveland

2300 Bp Tower, 200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Joseph R. Blalock

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff - Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

10 #3

Appendix C - Witness List

10 #2

Appendix B - Exhibit List

10 #1

Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order

#10

(#10) Case Management Plan and Trial Order. Case is assigned to the Standard Track; Deadline to add parties or amend pleadings 5/15/2020; Deadline for completing non-expert discovery 11/10/2020; The parties have agreed to follow the default standard for discovery of electronically-stored information; Deadline for party with burden of proof to identify experts and provide reports 12/11/2020; Deadline to identify rebuttal experts and provide reports 1/11/2021; Deadline for completing expert discovery 2/15/2021; Deadline for filing dispositive motions 3/15/2021; Deadline for filing oppositions to motions 4/12/2021; Deadline for filing replies to responses 4/21/2021; Status Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 11:30 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 1:00 p.m.; Jury Trial set on two week standby period beginning 7/26/2021 at 8:00 a.m. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C - Witness List) (D,S) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#9

(#9) Supplemental Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and L.R. 16.3(b) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Defendants. (Baisden, W.) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#8

(#8) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and L.R. 16.3(b) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Defendants. (Baisden, W.) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,N) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

6 #1

Report of Parties' Planning Meeting

#6

(#6) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 3/23/2020 at 1:00 p.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. The telephone conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 3/2/2020. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 3/9/2020. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(D,N) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#5

(#5) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Rob Crano, Summa Health Systems. (Baisden, W.) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

4 #2

Appendix B - Exhibit List

4 #1

Appendix A - Witness List

#4

(#4) Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (T,Je) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (T,Je) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A: State Court Action

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal from Summit County Common Pleas, OH, case number CV-2019-12-4859 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9748865.. Filed by Summa Health Systems, Rob Crano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Action, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baisden, W.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case Management Plan and Trial Order. Case is assigned to the Standard Track; Deadline to add parties or amend pleadings 5/15/2020; Deadline for completing non-expert discovery 11/10/2020; The parties have agreed to follow the default standard for discovery of electronically-stored information; Deadline for party with burden of proof to identify experts and provide reports 12/11/2020; Deadline to identify rebuttal experts and provide reports 1/11/2021; Deadline for completing expert discovery 2/15/2021; Deadline for filing dispositive motions 3/15/2021; Deadline for filing oppositions to motions 4/12/2021; Deadline for filing replies to responses 4/21/2021; Status Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 11:30 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 1:00 p.m.; Jury Trial set on two week standby period beginning 7/26/2021 at 8:00 a.m. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C - Witness List) (D,S) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketMinutes of proceedings [non-document]: The telephonic Case Management Conference was conducted on 3/23/2020 by Judge Sara Lioi. Attorney Daniel Dubow participated on behalf of plaintiff; Attorney Joseph Blalock participated on behalf of defendants. The Court discussed case management deadlines and the same will issue by separate order. Plaintiff has presented a demand to defendants, to which the defendants will respond, perhaps after initial discovery. Additionally, the Court advised that, should the parties have an interest in court-annexed mediation, they may request a referral at such time as it seems feasible, including via the required 45-day joint status reports. (Court reporter: None.) (Time: 10 minutes.) (D,S) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Supplemental Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and L.R. 16.3(b) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Defendants. (Baisden, W.) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and L.R. 16.3(b) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Defendants. (Baisden, W.) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,N) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 3/23/2020 at 1:00 p.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. The telephone conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 3/2/2020. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 3/9/2020. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(D,N) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Rob Crano, Summa Health Systems. (Baisden, W.) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (T,Je) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (T,Je) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (T,Je) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketJudge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (T,Je) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Summa Health Systems. (Baisden, W.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Summit County Common Pleas, OH, case number CV-2019-12-4859 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9748865.. Filed by Summa Health Systems, Rob Crano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Action, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baisden, W.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUMMA HEALTH SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel S. Dubow

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian D. Spitz