Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 16:49:08 (UTC).

Brunner v. Avalon Bay Communites Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Brunner filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Avalon Bay Communites Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sallie Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-03992

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sallie Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Seth Brunner

Defendant

Avalon Bay Communites Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas J. Tarkoff

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

100 Pringle Avenue, Sute 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Mary Kay Glaspy

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

100 Pringle Avenue, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Nicole N. Hancock

Attorney at Shea and Shea

2007 West Hedding Street, Suite 100

San Jose, CA 95128

Mark B. O'Connor

Attorney at Shea and Shea

2007 West Hedding Street, Suite 100

San Jose, CA 95128

Michael Murt Shea, Jr

Attorney at Shea & Shea

2007 West Hedding Street, Suite 100

San Jose, CA 95128

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avalon Bay Communites Inc. re #10 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Avalon Bay Communites Inc... (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Seth Brunner.. (Shea, Michael) (Filed on 6/9/2021) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Avalon Bay Communites Inc. re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/28/2021) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Avalon Bay Communites Inc. (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/27/2021) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Tarkoff (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/26/2021) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Avalon Bay Communites Inc. Notice of Re-Filing State Court ANSWER to Removed Complaint (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/26/2021) Modified on 5/27/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Avalon Bay Communites Inc. . (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/26/2021) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV364441. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16012707). Filed byAvalon Bay Communites Inc.. (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/26/2021) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avalon Bay Communites Inc. re #10 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Avalon Bay Communites Inc... (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Seth Brunner.. (Shea, Michael) (Filed on 6/9/2021) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Avalon Bay Communites Inc. re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/28/2021) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Avalon Bay Communites Inc. (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/27/2021) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/9/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Tarkoff (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/26/2021) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Avalon Bay Communites Inc. Notice of Re-Filing State Court ANSWER to Removed Complaint (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/26/2021) Modified on 5/27/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Avalon Bay Communites Inc. . (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/26/2021) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV364441. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16012707). Filed byAvalon Bay Communites Inc.. (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/26/2021) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas J. Tarkoff