This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2021 at 07:33:45 (UTC).

Brunckhorst III et al v. Bischoff et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Brunckhorst III filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bischoff. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04362

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Brunckhorst III

Defendants

Eric Bischoff

Susan Stravitz Kemp

The Eric Bischoff 2012 Trust

J.P. Morgan Trust Company of Delaware

Richard Todd Stravitz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Randall Neuwirth

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Marlo A. Pecora

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel

51 Madison Ave

New York, NY 10016

Carolyn L. Hart

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

1300 I Street Nw, Ste 900

Washington, DC 20005

Kathleen Alice Lanigan

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

1300 I Street Nw, Ste 900

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Taleah Esperanza Jennings

Attorney at Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP (NY)

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Michael Everett Swartz

Attorney at Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP (NY)

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Philip A. Goldstein

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP (NYC)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Meghan Lynne Gehr Hubbard

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219-3916

 

Court Documents

#29

#20

#35

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#22

#21

#19

#18

#17

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION for Meghan Lynne Gehr Hubbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24778509. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Richard Todd Stravitz(in his capacity as trustee of the Barbara Brunckhorst 2010 Trust), Susan Stravitz Kemp(in her capacityh as co-trustee of the Barbara Brunckhorst 1994 Trust). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Meghan Lynne Gehr Hubbard, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Hubbard, Meghan) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,,, addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Philip A. Goldstein dated July 12, 2021. Document filed by Richard Todd Stravitz(in his capacity as trustee of the Barbara Brunckhorst 2010 Trust), Richard Todd Stravitz(in his capacity as co-trustee of the Barbara Brunckhorst 1994 Trust), Richard Todd Stravitz(in his capacity as executor of the Estate of Barbara Brunckhorst), Susan Stravitz Kemp(in her capacityh as co-trustee of the Barbara Brunckhorst 1994 Trust), Susan Stravitz Kemp(in her capacity as executrix of the Estate of Barbara Brunckhorst)..(Goldstein, Philip) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 7/26/2021.(ah) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER granting #33 Motion for Kathleen A. Lanigan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan)(Text Only Order) (mhe) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Kathleen A. Lanigan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION for Kathleen A. Lanigan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Frank Brunckhorst III(in his capacity as trustee of the Frank Brunckhorst III 2001 Trust), Frank Brunckhorst III(individually). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing in the District of Columbia Court of Appeals, #3 Certificate of Good Standing in the Virginia Supreme Court, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Lanigan, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting #31 Motion for Carolyn Lieber Hart to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan)(Text Only Order) (mhe) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for Carolyn Lieber Hart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24668687. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION for Carolyn Lieber Hart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24668687. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Frank Brunckhorst III(in his capacity as trustee of the Frank Brunckhorst III 2001 Trust), Frank Brunckhorst III(individually). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for the District of Columbia Court of Appeals, #3 Certificate of Good Standing in the Appellate Division of the Supreme Court of New York, Third Judicial Department, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Hart, Carolyn) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #30 MOTION for Kathleen A. Lanigan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia; ;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (vba) Modified on 6/14/2021 (bcu). (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Eric Bischoff 2012 Trust, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Frank Brunckhorst III(in his capacity as trustee of the Frank Brunckhorst III 2001 Trust), Frank Brunckhorst III(individually)..(Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Susan Stravitz Kemp, in her capacity as co-trustee of The Barbara Brunckhorst 1994 Trust and executrix of The Estate of Barbara Brunckhorst, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Frank Brunckhorst III(in his capacity as trustee of the Frank Brunckhorst III 2001 Trust), Frank Brunckhorst III(individually)..(Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard Todd Stravitz, in his capacity as co-trustee of The Barbara Brunckhorst 1994 Trust, trustee of The Barbara Brunckhorst 2010 trust, and the executor of The Estate of Barbara Brunckhorst, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Frank Brunckhorst III(in his capacity as trustee of the Frank Brunckhorst III 2001 Trust), Frank Brunckhorst III(individually)..(Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.P. Morgan Trust Company of Delaware, as trustee of The Eric Bischoff 2012 Trust, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Frank Brunckhorst III(in his capacity as trustee of the Frank Brunckhorst III 2001 Trust), Frank Brunckhorst III(individually)..(Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eric Bischoff, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Frank Brunckhorst III(in his capacity as trustee of the Frank Brunckhorst III 2001 Trust), Frank Brunckhorst III(individually)..(Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketORDER REDACTING PLEADING FILED IN 21-MC-432. Document filed by Frank Brunckhorst III(in his capacity as trustee of the Frank Brunckhorst III 2001 Trust), Frank Brunckhorst III(individually)..(jgo) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(jgo) (jgo). (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Eric Bischoff, J.P. Morgan Trust Company of Delaware, Richard Todd Stravitz(in his capacity as trustee of the Barbara Brunckhorst 2010 Trust), Richard Todd Stravitz(in his capacity as co-trustee of the Barbara Brunckhorst 1994 Trust), Richard Todd Stravitz(in his capacity as executor of the Estate of Barbara Brunckhorst), Susan Stravitz Kemp(in her capacityh as co-trustee of the Barbara Brunckhorst 1994 Trust), Susan Stravitz Kemp(in her capacity as executrix of the Estate of Barbara Brunckhorst), The Eric Bischoff 2012 Trust. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 465401279488)Document filed by Frank Brunckhorst III(in his capacity as trustee of the Frank Brunckhorst III 2001 Trust), Frank Brunckhorst III(individually)..(jgo) (jgo). (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JP MORGAN ALTERNATIVE LOAN TRUST 2005 S1 MTG PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marlo A. Pecora

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen R. Neuwirth