This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2020 at 09:20:27 (UTC).

Brumfield v. Medtronic, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 Brumfield filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00522

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John David Brumfield

Defendants

Medtronic Logistics, LLC

Medtronic, Inc.

Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Co.

Medtronic USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert V. Berthold, III

Attorney at BERTHOLD LAW FIRM

P. O. Box 3508

Charleston, WV 25335-3508

Robert V. Berthold, Jr.

Attorney at BERTHOLD LAW FIRM

P. O. Box 3508

Charleston, WV 25335-3508

Ellen A. Presby

Attorney at VAN WEY PRESBY & WILLIAMS

Hillcrest Tower, Suite 600, 12720 Hillcrest Road

Dallas, TX 75230

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Lori Cohen on 9/21/2020. Medtronic USA, Inc. waiver mailed on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Modified on 9/23/2020 to add answer deadline) (ts).

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Lori Cohen on 9/21/2020. Medtronic Puerto Rico Co. waiver mailed on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Modified on 9/23/2020 to add answer deadline) (ts).

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Lori Cohen on 9/21/2020. Medtronic Logistics, LLC waiver mailed on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Modified on 9/23/2020 to add answer deadline)(ts)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Lori Cohen on 9/21/2020. Medtronic, Inc. waiver mailed on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Modified on 9/23/2020 to add answer deadline) (ts).

4 #3

Summons issued as to Medtronic USA, Inc.

4 #2

Summons issued as to Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Co.

4 #1

Summons issued as to Medtronic Logistics, LLC

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Co., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., re: #3 Amended Complaint. Summons returnable 14 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Medtronic Logistics, LLC, #2 Summons issued as to Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Co., #3 Summons issued as to Medtronic USA, Inc.) (kew)

3 #4

Proposed Summons as to Medtronic USA, Inc.

3 #3

Proposed Summons as to Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Co.

3 #2

Proposed Summons as to Medtronic Logistics, LLC

3 #1

Proposed Summons as to Medtronic, Inc.

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT by John David Brumfield against Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Co., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Medtronic, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons as to Medtronic Logistics, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons as to Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Co., #4 Proposed Summons as to Medtronic USA, Inc.) (kew)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)

1 #15

Exhibit 14a

1 #14

Exhibit 14

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESET ANSWER DEADLINES as to Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Co., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. for 11/17/2020 pursuant to #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 Waivers of Service. (ts) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Lori Cohen on 9/21/2020. Medtronic USA, Inc. waiver mailed on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Modified on 9/23/2020 to add answer deadline) (ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Lori Cohen on 9/21/2020. Medtronic Puerto Rico Co. waiver mailed on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Modified on 9/23/2020 to add answer deadline) (ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Lori Cohen on 9/21/2020. Medtronic Logistics, LLC waiver mailed on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Modified on 9/23/2020 to add answer deadline)(ts)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Lori Cohen on 9/21/2020. Medtronic, Inc. waiver mailed on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Modified on 9/23/2020 to add answer deadline) (ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Co., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., re: #3 Amended Complaint. Summons returnable 14 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Medtronic Logistics, LLC, #2 Summons issued as to Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Co., #3 Summons issued as to Medtronic USA, Inc.) (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT by John David Brumfield against Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Co., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Medtronic, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons as to Medtronic Logistics, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons as to Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations, Co., #4 Proposed Summons as to Medtronic USA, Inc.) (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7694471. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 14a, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert V. Berthold, III