This case was last updated from PACER on 07/08/2019 at 07:48:41 (UTC).

Brumfield v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 Brumfield filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00293

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Patrick Brumfield

Defendants

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Ducane Gas Grills, Inc.

Weber-Stephen Products, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Namisha D. Patel

Attorney at The Maughan Law Firm

634 Connell'S Park Lane

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Joshua David Roy

Attorney at Maughan Law Firm

634 Connell'S Park Ln

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Roy H. Maughan, Jr.

Attorney at The Maughan Law Firm

634 Connell'S Park Lane

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Defendant Attorneys

Renee D. Summer

Attorney at Melchiode Marks King LLC

639 Loyola Avenue, Suite 2550

New Orleans, LA 70113

Richard E. King

Attorney at Melchiode Marks King LLC

639 Loyola Avenue, Suite 2550

New Orleans, LA 70113

Albert C. Miranda

Attorney at Law Offices of Julie E. Vaicius

3900 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 1040

Metairie, LA 70002

Thomas Hudson Barnett

Attorney at Law Office of Julie Vaicius

3900 North Causeway Blvd., Suite 1040

Metairie, LA 70002

Julie Eustis Vaicius

Attorney at The Law Offices of Julie E. Vaicius

3900 North Causeway Boulevard, Suite 1040

Metairie, LA 70002

Erin O'Brien Braud

Attorney at GuideOne Insurance Company

650 Poydras, Suite 1400

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) JUDGMENT Remanding Case to the 20th Judicial District Court, West Feliciana Parish. Certified copy of this order sent to 20th Judicial District Court. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 6/26/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#8

(#8) OPINION Adopting #7 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. This action is REMANDED to the 20th Judicial District Court, West Feliciana Parish, Louisiana. The pending #6 Motion to Remand is denied as moot. Judgment shall entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 6/26/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#7

(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that this action be REMANDED to the 20th Judicial District Court, West Feliciana Parish, Louisiana. It is further recommended that the pending #6 Motion to Remand be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/11/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

6 #2

Proposed Pleading; Order

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand by John Patrick Brumfield. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Maughan, Roy) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

List of Parties

1 #9

Consent to Removal

1 #8

Corporate Disclosure

1 #7

Verification

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial District Court, Parish of West Feliciana, Case Number 23352. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1940124), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Verification, #8 Corporate Disclosure, #9 Consent to Removal, #10 List of Parties, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Summer, Renee) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JUDGMENT Remanding Case to the 20th Judicial District Court, West Feliciana Parish. Certified copy of this order sent to 20th Judicial District Court. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 6/26/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) OPINION Adopting #7 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. This action is REMANDED to the 20th Judicial District Court, West Feliciana Parish, Louisiana. The pending #6 Motion to Remand is denied as moot. Judgment shall entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 6/26/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that this action be REMANDED to the 20th Judicial District Court, West Feliciana Parish, Louisiana. It is further recommended that the pending #6 Motion to Remand be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/11/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Remand by John Patrick Brumfield. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Maughan, Roy) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Letter dated 5/30/2019 regarding #4 Order and Inability to Comply with Order by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Summer, Renee) Modified on 5/31/2019 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 5/30/2019, the removing defendant shall file an amended notice of removal providing the citizenship of defendant Weber-Stephen Products, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/22/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (SWE) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial District Court, Parish of West Feliciana, Case Number 23352. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1940124), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Verification, #8 Corporate Disclosure, #9 Consent to Removal, #10 List of Parties, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Summer, Renee) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.