This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/07/2022 at 06:02:50 (UTC).

Bruessard v. AT&T Corp.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2022 Bruessard filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AT T Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00270

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karla Bruessard

Defendant

AT&T Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Ryan Custardo

Attorney at Custardo Law, LLC

2135 City Gate Lane, Suite 300

Naperville, IL 60563

Defendant Attorneys

Rafael Eduardo Lazaro

Attorney at Lazaro Law Group, LLC

321 S. Plymouth Court, Suite 1250

Chicago, IL 60604

Stacey Alan Campbell

Attorney at Campbell Litigation, P.c.

1410 N. High Street

Denver, CO 80218

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Karla Bruessard; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19061758. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Attorney Appearance)(Custardo, Matthew) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Filing Attorney Appearance

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Karla Bruessard by Matthew Ryan Custardo (Custardo, Matthew) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#3

(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint status report due by 2/28/2022. Initial telephone conference is set for 3/3/2022 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karla Bruessard as to AT&T Corp. on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. served on AT&T on 1-28-2022 (Custardo, Matthew) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 2/15/2022 (bg, ). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#5

(#5) Defendant ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AT&T Corp.(Lazaro, Rafael) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant AT&T Corp. for disclosure (Lazaro, Rafael) Modified on 2/22/2022 (bg, ). (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendant's corporate disclosure statement #6 is accepted. However, the Clerk is directed to remove the gavel from the docket as the statement is not a motion.Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Correction re #6 (bg, ) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION by Defendant AT&T Corp. for extension of time Joint Motion for Status Report (Lazaro, Rafael) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint motion for extension of time to file status report and reset date for status conference #9 is granted. Telephone status hearing set for 3/3/2022 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Deadline for filing joint status report is extended to 3/7/2022. The telephone status hearing will be reset after review of the joint status report. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&T Corp. by Stacey Alan Campbell (Campbell, Stacey) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&T Corp. by Rafael Eduardo Lazaro (Lazaro, Rafael) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#13

(#13) STATUS Report Joint by AT&T Corp. (Campbell, Stacey) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STATUS Report Joint by AT&T Corp. (Campbell, Stacey) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&T Corp. by Rafael Eduardo Lazaro (Lazaro, Rafael) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&T Corp. by Stacey Alan Campbell (Campbell, Stacey) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint motion for extension of time to file status report and reset date for status conference #9 is granted. Telephone status hearing set for 3/3/2022 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Deadline for filing joint status report is extended to 3/7/2022. The telephone status hearing will be reset after review of the joint status report. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Defendant AT&T Corp. for extension of time Joint Motion for Status Report (Lazaro, Rafael) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Correction re #6 (bg, ) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendant's corporate disclosure statement #6 is accepted. However, the Clerk is directed to remove the gavel from the docket as the statement is not a motion.Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant AT&T Corp. for disclosure (Lazaro, Rafael) Modified on 2/22/2022 (bg, ). (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AT&T Corp.(Lazaro, Rafael) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karla Bruessard as to AT&T Corp. on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. served on AT&T on 1-28-2022 (Custardo, Matthew) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 2/15/2022 (bg, ). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint status report due by 2/28/2022. Initial telephone conference is set for 3/3/2022 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant AT&T Corp. (jxj, ) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Karla Bruessard by Matthew Ryan Custardo (Custardo, Matthew) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxj, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jxj, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Karla Bruessard; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19061758. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Attorney Appearance)(Custardo, Matthew) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rafael Eduardo Lazaro(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacey A. Campbell