This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/03/2020 at 09:26:34 (UTC).

BRP Colleague Inc. et al v. Gillen et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 BRP Colleague Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gillen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03695

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRP Colleague Inc.

Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC

Defendants

Edward (Teddy) Gillen

Edgewood Partners Insurance Center Inc. doing business as Epic Insurance Brokers & Consultants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Elizabeth Jensen

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Atl

Suite 4800, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303

Todd Clifford Duffield

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Atl

Suite 4800, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303

Susanna Bramlett

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Atl

Suite 4800, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303

Defendant Attorneys

Steven D. Pearson

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels, LLP-IL

311 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Melissa Buckshorn

Attorney at Stone & Bellus, P.C.

Building B-3 Suite 100, 6849 Peachtree Dunwoody Road, Peachtree Dunwoody Park

Atlanta, GA 30328

John Edward Bellus, Jr.

Attorney at Stone & Bellus, P.C.

Building B-3 Suite 100, 6849 Peachtree Dunwoody Road, Peachtree Dunwoody Park

Atlanta, GA 30328

F.R. Josh Stone, Jr.

Attorney at Stone & Bellus, P.C.

Building B-3 Suite 100, 6849 Peachtree Dunwoody Road, Peachtree Dunwoody Park

Atlanta, GA 30328

 

Court Documents

#45

#44

#43

#42

#41

#40

#39

#34

#33

8 #2

Exhibit A - Declaration of Gregg Schieffelbein

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Edward "Teddy" Gillen by BRP Colleague Inc., Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC.(Jensen, Amy) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant EPIC by BRP Colleague Inc., Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC.(Jensen, Amy) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant EPIC by BRP Colleague Inc., Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC.(Jensen, Amy) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Edward "Teddy" Gillen by BRP Colleague Inc., Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC.(Jensen, Amy) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Inspection to Defendants by BRP Colleague Inc., Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC.(Jensen, Amy) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #33 Certificate of Interested Persons and #34 Certificate of Interested Persons. Read and approved by LMM. (bnp) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Disclosures by Edgewood Partners Insurance Center Inc., Edward (Teddy) Gillen.(Bellus, John) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by BRP Colleague Inc., Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC.(Jensen, Amy) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) RESPONSE re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Edgewood Partners Insurance Center Inc., Edward (Teddy) Gillen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Secretary of State printout)(Bellus, John) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER: Pending the Court's decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the Court finds good cause to extend the duration of the injunctive relief imposed by the Court's prior order. The injunction will remain in place until November 16, 2020, or until the Court resolves Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, whichever is earlier. The Court will DEFER its decision on whether to convert the order into a more extensive preliminary injunction until Defendants have had an opportunity to respond to Plaintiff's motion. Because the Court will grant an expedited review of this motion, Defendants can reduce the time this Order remains in place by an early response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/22/2020. (tmf) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER directing the parties to appear for a hearing on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #8 on Wednesday, September 23, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2107. Plaintiffs are to serve Defendants with a copy of this Order, the Complaint, and the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #8 by Tuesday, September 15, 2020. Defendants are to file a Response Brief by 9:00 a.m. on Monday, September 21, 2020. If Plaintiffs are inclined to file a Reply Brief, their reply shall be due by 12:00 p.m. on Tuesday, September 22, 2020. The Court will contact the parties to determine if this hearing will be held in person or via videoconference. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/10/2020. (ddm) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Expedite Discovery, to Require Defendants to Respond to this Motion in Five Days with Brief In Support by BRP Colleague Inc., Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC. (Duffield, Todd) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by BRP Colleague Inc., Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Other Relief, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Gregg Schieffelbein)(Duffield, Todd) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BRP Colleague Inc., Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC. (Duffield, Todd) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/10/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Leigh Martin May for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-03695-LMM. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 9/9/2020. (tcc) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Edgewood Partners Insurance Center Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Edward (Teddy) Gillen. (eop) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by BRP Colleague Inc. and Baldwin Krystyn Sherman Partners, LLC.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10112254) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDGEWOOD PARTNERS INSURANCE CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Ann Buckshorn