This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2020 at 09:37:24 (UTC).

Browse3D LLC v. Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Browse3D LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00649

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Browse3D LLC

Defendants

Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC

Bass Pro, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

100 Congress Ave, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

8 #1

Proposed Order

#9

9 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#11

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Browse3D LLC. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Browse3D LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC answer due 9/16/2020; Bass Pro, LLC answer due 9/16/2020. (lad) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiff's Motion to extend the time for Defendant to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including September 16, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Browse3D LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Bass Pro, LLC. (bw) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC. (bw) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Browse3D LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Browse3D LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13771813), filed by Browse3D LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Browse3D LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bass Pro, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bass Pro Outdoor World LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond W Mort, III