This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:49:54 (UTC).

Brownlee v. Jacob et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 Brownlee filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Jacob. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian S. Miller and James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00208

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Brian S. Miller

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lillie Brownlee

Defendants

Jacob Law Group PLLC

Michael A Jacob, II

Midland Credit Management Inc

Midland Funding LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Thomas Crowder

Attorney at Crowder McGaha, LLP

5507 Ranch Drive, Suite 202

Little Rock, AR 72223

Cathleen M. Combs

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Daniel A. Edelman

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Corey Darnell McGaha

Attorney at Crowder McGaha, LLP

5507 Ranch Drive, Suite 202

Little Rock, AR 72223

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Fletcher

Attorney at Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.

Regions Center, Suite 1900, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201

Michael Norris Shannon

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

 

Court Documents

#1

(#4) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Midland Credit Management Inc answer due 5/15/2019; Midland Funding LLC answer due 5/15/2019.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/19/19. (lp) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#4) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Midland Credit Management Inc answer due 5/15/2019; Midland Funding LLC answer due 5/15/2019.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/19/19. (lp) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Norris Shannon on behalf of Midland Credit Management Inc, Midland Funding LLC (Shannon, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Lillie Brownlee. Jacob Law Group PLLC served on 4/3/2019. (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Lillie Brownlee. Midland Funding LLC served on 4/3/2019. (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Fletcher on behalf of Michael A Jacob, II, Jacob Law Group PLLC (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #16 motion to consolidate. The Clerk is directed to reassign Welch v. Jacob, et al, 5:19-cv-105-BRW, and Brownlee v. Jacob, et al, 4:19-cv-208-BSM, to this Court. The cases will be consolidated with Campbell v. Jacob, et al., 4:19-cv-179 as the lead case. All filings should be made in the lead case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/8/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Order Assigning Case as Related by Lillie Brownlee (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#17

(#17) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Motion for Order Assigning Case as Related filed by Lillie Brownlee. (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#15

(#15) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/26/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/10/2019. Jury Trial set for 5/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/26/19. (lp) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#14

(#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint - Class Action , filed by Lillie Brownlee. Michael A Jacob, II served on 4/15/2019. (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#7

NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the party served as Midland Credit Management Inc on 4/3/2019. (jak) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#9

(#13) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/24/19. (lp) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#8

(#13) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/24/19. (lp) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Jacob Law Group PLLC (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#14

(#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint - Class Action , filed by Lillie Brownlee. Michael A Jacob, II served on 4/15/2019. (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Lillie Brownlee. Midland Funding LLC served on 4/3/2019. (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Cases associated. Create association to 4:19-cv-00179-JM pursuant to #18 Order. (ljb) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #18 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #16 motion to consolidate. The Clerk is directed to reassign Welch v. Jacob, et al, 5:19-cv-105-BRW, and Brownlee v. Jacob, et al, 4:19-cv-208-BSM, to this Court. The cases will be consolidated with Campbell v. Jacob, et al., 4:19-cv-179 as the lead case. All filings should be made in the lead case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/8/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Motion for Order Assigning Case as Related filed by Lillie Brownlee. (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Order Assigning Case as Related by Lillie Brownlee (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/26/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/10/2019. Jury Trial set for 5/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/26/19. (lp) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint - Class Action , filed by Lillie Brownlee. Michael A Jacob, II served on 4/15/2019. (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the party served as Midland Credit Management Inc on 4/3/2019. (jak) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/24/19. (lp) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Jacob Law Group PLLC (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Fletcher on behalf of Michael A Jacob, II, Jacob Law Group PLLC (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Cathleen M Combs. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3447947. Filed by Lillie Brownlee (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Daniel A Edelman. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3447937. Filed by Lillie Brownlee (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Lillie Brownlee. Midland Credit Management Inc served on 4/3/2019. (McGaha, Corey) (Docket text modified on 4/24/2019 to indicate the party served) (jak) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Lillie Brownlee. Midland Funding LLC served on 4/3/2019. (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Lillie Brownlee. Jacob Law Group PLLC served on 4/3/2019. (McGaha, Corey) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Midland Credit Management Inc answer due 5/15/2019; Midland Funding LLC answer due 5/15/2019.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/19/19. (lp) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Norris Shannon on behalf of Midland Credit Management Inc, Midland Funding LLC (Shannon, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Midland Credit Management Inc, Midland Funding LLC (Shannon, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Lillie Brownlee. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT071421. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.