Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2021 at 10:37:14 (UTC).

Browne v. Hess Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Browne filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Hess Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are George W. Cannon, Jr and Wilma A. Lewis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00231

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virgin Islands District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

George W. Cannon, Jr

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edwin Browne

Christiansted, VI 00821

Defendants

Hess Oil New York Corp.

200 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Hess Corporation

200 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Virgin Islands Industrial Maintenance Corp.

1138 King Street, Suite 100

Christiansted, VI 00820

Hess Oil New York Corp, as successer by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John-Russell Bart Pate

Attorney at J.R. Pate, PC - Law Office

P.O. Box 890, Royal Dane Mall 10-Aa

St. Thomas, VI 00804

Korey A Nelson

Attorney at Burns and Charest LLP

Warren T Burns

Attorney at Burns Charest LLP

900 Jackson Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

Carolyn F. O'Connor

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP

200 Campus Drive, Ste 4Th Fl.

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Joseph T. Hanlon

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP

200 Campus Drive, Ste 4Th Fl.

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Carl A Beckstedt, III

Attorney at Beckstedt and Associate

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820-4604

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T. Hanlon on behalf of Defendant Hess Corporation (Hanlon, Joseph) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hess Oil New York Corp, as successer by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp.. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Consent by Hess Oil New York Corp, as successer by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. re #1 Notice of Removal, (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn F. O'Connor on behalf of Defendant Hess Oil New York Corp, as successer by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendants Hess Corporation, Hess Oil New York Corp, as successer by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Corporation. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hess Corporation. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn F. O'Connor on behalf of Defendant Hess Corporation (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A-1

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Hess Corporation from Superior Court, Division of St. Croix, case number SX-21-CV-049. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-927972)filed by Hess Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T. Hanlon on behalf of Defendant Hess Corporation (Hanlon, Joseph) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hess Oil New York Corp, as successer by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp.. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Consent by Hess Oil New York Corp, as successer by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. re #1 Notice of Removal, (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn F. O'Connor on behalf of Defendant Hess Oil New York Corp, as successer by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendants Hess Corporation, Hess Oil New York Corp, as successer by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Corporation. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hess Corporation. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn F. O'Connor on behalf of Defendant Hess Corporation (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Hess Corporation from Superior Court, Division of St. Croix, case number SX-21-CV-049. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-927972)filed by Hess Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hess Oil New York Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where VIRGIN ISLAND CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where HESS is a litigant