Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2020 at 14:26:25 (UTC).

Browne v. Enerfin Resources Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 Browne filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Enerfin Resources Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00084

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marian D. Browne

Defendants

Enerfin Resources I Limited Partnership

Enerfin Resources Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reagan E. Bradford

Attorney at Lanier Law Firm (OKC)

431 W Main St, Ste D

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Margaret E. Robertson

Attorney at Lanier Law Firm (OKC)

431 W Main St, Ste D

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Ryan K. Wilson

Attorney at Lanier Law Firm (OKC)

431 W Main St, Ste D

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick L. Stein

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (OKC)

211 N Robinson, 10Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

Jodi C. Cole

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (OKC)

211 N Robinson, 10Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

Justin Todd Woolery

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (OKC)

211 N Robinson, 10Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Enerfin Management LLC for Enerfin Resources Company, Enerfin Resources I Limited Partnership) by Enerfin Resources Company, Enerfin Resources I Limited Partnership (Woolery, Justin) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Enerfin Resources Company, Enerfin Resources I Limited Partnership (Woolery, Justin) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jodi C. Cole on behalf of All Defendants (Cole, Jodi) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrick L. Stein on behalf of All Defendants (Stein, Patrick) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by All Defendants Responses due by 4/27/2020(Woolery, J.) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Todd Woolery on behalf of All Defendants (Woolery, J.) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Enerfin Resources I Limited Partnership (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Enerfin Resources Company (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Margaret E. Robertson on behalf of Marian D. Browne (Robertson, Margaret) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan K. Wilson on behalf of Marian D. Browne (Wilson, Ryan) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 3/26/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Enerfin Resources Company, Enerfin Resources I Limited Partnership by Marian D. Browne (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Marian D. Browne (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Enerfin Management LLC for Enerfin Resources Company, Enerfin Resources I Limited Partnership) by Enerfin Resources Company, Enerfin Resources I Limited Partnership (Woolery, Justin) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Enerfin Resources Company, Enerfin Resources I Limited Partnership (Woolery, Justin) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jodi C. Cole on behalf of All Defendants (Cole, Jodi) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Enerfin Resources Company answer due 4/28/2020; Enerfin Resources I Limited Partnership answer due 4/28/2020. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrick L. Stein on behalf of All Defendants (Stein, Patrick) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by All Defendants Responses due by 4/27/2020(Woolery, J.) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Todd Woolery on behalf of All Defendants (Woolery, J.) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Enerfin Resources I Limited Partnership (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Enerfin Resources Company (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Margaret E. Robertson on behalf of Marian D. Browne (Robertson, Margaret) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan K. Wilson on behalf of Marian D. Browne (Wilson, Ryan) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/20/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1351759 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Marian D. Browne (Bradford, Reagan) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 3/26/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Enerfin Resources Company, Enerfin Resources I Limited Partnership by Marian D. Browne (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Marian D. Browne (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jodi C. Cole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Todd Woolery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick L. Stein