This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/31/2021 at 07:22:37 (UTC).

Cleveland Constantine Browne et al v. Rodney Sebastian Clark Donalds et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 Cleveland Constantine Browne filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Rodney Sebastian Clark Donalds. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02840

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cleveland Constantine Browne

The Estate Of Wycliffe Johnson

Steely & Clevie Productions Ltd.

Steely and Clevie Productions Ltd.

Defendants

Rashid Badloe

Bilal Hajji

Carolina Giraldo Navarro

Jose Carlos Garcia

Rodney Sebastian Clark Donalds

Juston Records

Burna Al

Armando Christian Prez

Giordano Ashruf

Sony Music Entertainment

Shareef Badloe

Jorge Gomez

We All Need 1 LLC

Kobalt Music Publishing Ltd

Universal Music Publishing, Inc.

Armando Christian Perez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A. Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Frank Trechsel

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

David Shein

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before 6/11/2021 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. Defendant(s) Universal Music Publishing, Inc. did not answer the complaint, yet Plaintiff(s) have failed to request entry of default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff(s) can satisfy this order by seeking entry of default or by dismissing the complaint. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Estate of Wycliffe Johnson, Cleveland Constantine Browne, Steely and Clevie Productions Ltd., upon Defendant Universal Music Publishing, Inc. served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System c/o Jessie Gastelum - Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #12 as to Defendants Rodney Sebastian Clark Donalds, Carolina Giraldo Navarro, Armando Christian Perez, Bilal Hajji, Jose Carlos Garcia, Burna Al, Jorge Gomez, Giordano Ashruf, Shareef Badloe, Rashid Badloe, Juston Records, Sony Music Entertainment d/b/a Ultra Music, Universal Music Publishing, Inc., BMG Rights Management, LLC, Warner Chappell Music, Kobalt Music Publishing Ltd, We All Need 1 LLC. (gk) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Plaintiffs Cleveland Constantine Browne, Steely and Clevie Productions Ltd., The Estate of Wycliffe Johnson. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Steely and Clevie Productions Ltd., The Estate of Wycliffe Johnson, Cleveland Constantine Browne(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-02840 AB (AFMx). (esa) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiffs Cleveland Constantine Browne, Steely and Clevie Productions Ltd., The Estate of Wycliffe Johnson. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar under the Civil Consent Pilot Project. The parties are reminded to review the time requirements for consent set forth in the Notice to Counsel that was issued at the time of the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff is instructed to forthwith serve a copy of this Order on all parties that have already been served with the summons and complaint, or to serve all parties with a copy of this Order at the time of service of the summons and complaint. (hr) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Burna Al, Giordano Ashruf, Rashid Badloe, Shareef Badloe, Rodney Sebastian Clark Donalds, Jose Carlos Garcia, Jorge Gomez, Bilal Hajji, Juston Records, Carolina Giraldo Navarro, Armando Christian Perez, Sony Music Entertainment. (lh) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Cleveland Constantine Browne, Steely & Clevie Productions Ltd., The Estate Of Wycliffe Johnson. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Cleveland Constantine Browne, Steely & Clevie Productions Ltd., The Estate Of Wycliffe Johnson. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Cleveland Constantine Browne, Steely & Clevie Productions Ltd., The Estate Of Wycliffe Johnson, (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Cleveland Constantine Browne, Steely & Clevie Productions Ltd., The Estate Of Wycliffe Johnson. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31033143 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Steely & Clevie Productions Ltd., The Estate Of Wycliffe Johnson, Cleveland Constantine Browne. (Attorney Scott A. Burroughs added to party Cleveland Constantine Browne(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A. Burroughs added to party Steely & Clevie Productions Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A. Burroughs added to party The Estate Of Wycliffe Johnson(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOBALT MUSIC PUBLISHING AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony Music Entertainment Italy S.p.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Music Publishing LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Shein