This case was last updated from PACER on 07/03/2020 at 09:28:39 (UTC).

Brown v. Weiser Ambulance District et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 Brown filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Weiser Ambulance District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judges overseeing this case are B. Lynn Winmill and Ronald E. Bush. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00211

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

B. Lynn Winmill

Ronald E. Bush

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashley Brown

Defendants

Larry Colella

Weiser Ambulance District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric S Rossman

Attorney at ROSSMAN LAW GROUP PLLC

350 N. 9Th Street, Suite 500

Boise, ID 83702

Erica S Phillips

Attorney at ROSSMAN LAW GROUP

737 N 7Th St

Boise, ID 83702

Matthew G Gunn

Attorney at Rossman Law Group, PLLC

350 N. 9Th Street, Suite 500

Boise, ID 83702

Defendant Attorneys

Tyler D Williams

Attorney at Naylor and Hales, P.C.

950 W. Bannock Street Suite 610

Boise, ID 83702

Jacob H. Naylor

Attorney at NAYLOR & HALES, P.C.

950 W. Bannock Street, Ste. 610

Boise, ID 83702

Bruce J Castleton

Attorney at NAYLOR AND HALES

950 W. Bannock St Ste 610

Boise, ID 83702

Pamela Simmons Howland

Attorney at Idaho Employment Lawyers, PLLC

1116 S. Vista Ave. #474

Boise, ID 83703

Rebecca L. Stewart

Attorney at Idaho Employment Lawyers, PLLC

1112 W. Main Street, Suite 105

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ckh)

#19

(#19) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER/TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: Rule 26f Conference to be held on or before 8/31/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/14/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Bill R Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 06/23/2020. (mb)

#17

(#17) JOINDER by Defendant Larry Colella joining #14 Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Williams, Tyler)

#16

(#16) SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Weiser Ambulance District re #15 Declaration Exhibit A. (Stewart, Rebecca)

#15

(#15) DECLARATION re #14 Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Weiser Ambulance District . (Stewart, Rebecca)

14 #1

Memorandum in Support

#14

(#14) Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Rebecca L. Stewart appearing for Defendant Weiser Ambulance District. Responses due by 7/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Stewart, Rebecca)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Larry Colella.(Naylor, Jacob)

#7

(#13) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Larry Colella.(Naylor, Jacob)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler D Williams on behalf of Larry Colella (Williams, Tyler)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ashley Brown, Larry Colella, Weiser Ambulance District re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/6/2020. (ckh)

1 #6

Certificate of Service

1 #5

Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#2) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ashley Brown, Larry Colella, Weiser Ambulance District re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/6/2020. (ckh)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald E. Bush for all further proceedings. Judge Bill R Wilson no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings: 1:20-cv-00211-REB. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER/TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: Rule 26f Conference to be held on or before 8/31/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/14/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Bill R Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 06/23/2020. (mb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Wilson. Please use case number 1:20-cv-00211-BRW on all future pleadings. (st)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docket(#18) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Bill R Wilson from the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) JOINDER by Defendant Larry Colella joining #14 Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Williams, Tyler)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Weiser Ambulance District re #15 Declaration Exhibit A. (Stewart, Rebecca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DECLARATION re #14 Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Weiser Ambulance District . (Stewart, Rebecca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Rebecca L. Stewart appearing for Defendant Weiser Ambulance District. Responses due by 7/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Stewart, Rebecca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Larry Colella.(Naylor, Jacob)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Larry Colella re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Weiser Ambulance District (Williams, Tyler)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Weiser Ambulance District filed by Ashley Brown. Replies due by 6/15/2020.(Gunn, Matthew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Larry Colella, Weiser Ambulance District, filed by Ashley Brown.(Gunn, Matthew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINDER by Defendant Larry Colella joining #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Weiser Ambulance District . (Williams, Tyler)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Weiser Ambulance District Pamela Simmons Howland appearing for Defendant Weiser Ambulance District. Responses due by 6/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Howland, Pamela)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Larry Colella.(Williams, Tyler)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler D Williams on behalf of Larry Colella (Williams, Tyler)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ashley Brown, Larry Colella, Weiser Ambulance District re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/6/2020. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Larry Colella served on 5/4/2020; Weiser Ambulance District served on 5/4/2020. (No return service document on file as to Weiser Ambulance District, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only.) (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Larry Colella from Washington County, case number CV44-19-0590.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2043508.), filed by Larry Colella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Washington County Complaint, #2 Exhibit - Washington County Summons, #3 Exhibit - Washington County Returned Summons (Colella), #4 Exhibit - Washington County Docket Sheet, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service)(Williams, Tyler) Modified on 5/5/2020 to correct exhibit names (ckh).

    Read MoreRead Less