This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 18:38:12 (UTC).

Brown v. Valdez et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 Brown filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Valdez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ada Brown and Renee Harris Toliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02332

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ada Brown

Referral Judge

Renee Harris Toliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Edward Brown

Defendants

Endel Aleksander Sorra

David Paul Chason

Parkland Memorial Hospital

Dianne Lirey

Frederick P Cerise

Lupe Valdez

Debra English

Parkland Memorial Hospital doing business as Parkland Health & Hospital System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Winston L Borum

Attorney at Watson Caraway Midkiff & Luningham LLP

306 W 7Th Street, Suite 200

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Philipa M Remington

Attorney at Thiebaud Remington Thornton Bailey LLP

Two Energy Square, 4849 Greenville Avenue, Suite 1150

Dallas, TX 75206

Cathryn R Paton

Attorney at Thiebaud Remington Thornton Bailey LLP

4849 Greenville Avenue, Suite 1150

Dallas, TX 75206

John Butrus

Attorney at Dallas County District Attorney

Frank Crowly Courts Building, 113 N. Riverfront Blvd, Lb 19

Dallas, TX 75207

J G Schuette

Attorney at Dallas County District Attorney

133 N. Riverfront Blvd., Lb19

Dallas, TX 75207

Barbara S Nicholas

Attorney at Dallas County District Attorney, Civil Division

411 Elm

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#19

#16

#14

8 #1

Additional Page(s) part 1 of 1

#7

#5

#4

3 #1

Additional Page(s) part 1 of 2

#3

2 #1

Cover Sheet Supplement part 1 of 1

#2

#1

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) RESPONSE filed by Frederick P Cerise, Dianne Lirey, Parkland Memorial Hospital re: #26 MOTION Requesting the Permission to go with the Amended Complaint that Cure the Deficiency of the Active Civil Cause (Borum, Winston) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION of Objection and to Clarify Amended Complaint Which Name New Defendants (Doc. #19 ) filed by Patrick Edward Brown. (axm) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by David Paul Chason re: #19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Remington, Philipa) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:27. Mon Nov 18 16:04:38 CST 2019 (crt) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER ACCEPTING #16 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: #9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Debra English, Endel Aleksander Sorra. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to terminate Sorra and English as defendants in this matter. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/18/2019) (aaa) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION Requesting the Permission to go with the Amended Complaint that Cure the Deficiency of the Active Civil Cause filed by Patrick Edward Brown. (axm) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) OBJECTION to #16 Findings and Recommendations by Patrick Edward Brown. (axm) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) RESPONSE filed by David Paul Chason re: #14 MOTION to Appoint Expert Witness (Remington, Philipa) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RESPONSE filed by Frederick P Cerise, Debra English, Dianne Lirey, Parkland Memorial Hospital, Endel Aleksander Sorra re: #19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Borum, Winston) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) RESPONSE filed by David Paul Chason re: #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Remington, Philipa) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss as "Abandoned" or "Non-Suited" of Defendants Sorra and English filed by Debra English, Endel Aleksander Sorra with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Borum, Winston) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Defendant Lupe Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) part 1 of 1) (Schuette, J) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,7. Wed Oct 2 08:24:45 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sre) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#6) *Please disregard* Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sre) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lupe Valdez. (Schuette, J) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Lupe Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) part 1 of 2, #2 Additional Page(s) part 2 of 2) (Schuette, J) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Lupe Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement part 1 of 1) (Schuette, J) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 191st Judicial District Court, Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-19-00086 filed by Lupe Valdez. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10304496) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Schuette, J) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Parkland Memorial Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barbara S Nicholas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philipa M Remington

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John J. Butrus Jr.