This case was last updated from PACER on 01/16/2021 at 10:25:44 (UTC).

Brown v. Total System Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 Brown filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Total System Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04685

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Erika L. Brown

Billie Quinn

LaRae Baptist

Defendants

Global Payments, Inc.

Total System Services, Inc.

Total System Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paolo C. Meireles

Attorney at Shavitz Law Group, P.A.

Suite 404, 1515 South Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Gregg I. Shavitz

Attorney at Shavitz Law Group, P.A.

Suite 404, 1515 South Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Rachel Berlin Benjamin

Attorney at Buckley Beal, LLP

Suite 3900, 600 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

Logan A Pardell

Attorney at Shavitz Law Group, P.A. - FL

951 Yamato Road

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendant Attorney

Nathan David Chapman

Attorney at Kabat Chapman & Ozmer, LLP

Suite 1550, 171 17Th Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

24 #2

Exhibit Consent to Join Form of Bianca Pryor

24 #1

Exhibit Consent to Join form of Anthonia Maon

#24

(#24) NOTICE Of Filing Consent to Join Forms for Opt-in Plaintiffs Anthonia Maon and Bianca Pryor by LaRae Baptist, Erika L. Brown, Billie Quinn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join form of Anthonia Maon, #2 Exhibit Consent to Join Form of Bianca Pryor)(Benjamin, Rachel) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#23

(#23) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by LaRae Baptist, Erika L. Brown, Billie Quinn. Total System Services, LLC served on 1/8/2021. (Benjamin, Rachel) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

22 #1

Proposed Order

#22

(#22) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #18 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Collective Action Complaint by Global Payments, Inc., Total System Services, Inc., Total System Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#21

(#21) Electronic Summons Issued as to Total System Services, LLC. (jpk) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

18 #1

Exhibit A - Consent to Join form of LaRae Baptist

#18

(#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by LaRae Baptist, Erika L. Brown, and Billie Quinn against Global Payments, Inc., Total System Services, Inc., and Total System Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join form of LaRae Baptist) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#3

(#3) Eighth Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (jpk) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

2 #1

Summons Global Payments, Inc.

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Global Payments, Inc. and Total System Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Global Payments, Inc.) (jpk) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Consent to Join of Erika L. Brown

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Erika L. Brown. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10384495) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join of Erika L. Brown, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/17/2020)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE Of Filing Consent to Join Forms for Opt-in Plaintiffs Anthonia Maon and Bianca Pryor by LaRae Baptist, Erika L. Brown, Billie Quinn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join form of Anthonia Maon, #2 Exhibit Consent to Join Form of Bianca Pryor)(Benjamin, Rachel) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by LaRae Baptist, Erika L. Brown, Billie Quinn. Total System Services, LLC served on 1/8/2021. (Benjamin, Rachel) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #18 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Collective Action Complaint by Global Payments, Inc., Total System Services, Inc., Total System Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Electronic Summons Issued as to Total System Services, LLC. (jpk) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpk) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by LaRae Baptist, Erika L. Brown, Billie Quinn (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Extend the Deadline to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference and Submit Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Parties shall conduct a Rule 26(f) conference on or before February 5, 2021 and shall submit a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan on or before February 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/5/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #16 RE-FILED CORRECTLY AT #18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Global Payments, Inc., Total System Services, Inc.with Jury Demand filed by Erika L. Brown, Billie Quinn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join form of LaRae Baptist)(Benjamin, Rachel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 1/5/2021 to add document restriction and red text (jpk). (jpk) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by LaRae Baptist, Erika L. Brown, and Billie Quinn against Global Payments, Inc., Total System Services, Inc., and Total System Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join form of LaRae Baptist) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Conduct Rule 26(F) Conference and Submit Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan by Erika L. Brown, Billie Quinn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Benjamin, Rachel) Modified on 1/5/2021 to edit text (jpk). (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Logan Pardell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10412268).. Attorney Logan Pardell added appearing on behalf of Erika L. Brown (nmb) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Paolo C. Meireles Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10412258).. Attorney Paolo C. Meireles added appearing on behalf of Erika L. Brown (nmb) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregg I. Shavitz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10412238).. Attorney Gregg I. Shavitz added appearing on behalf of Erika L. Brown (nmb) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission of Logan Pardell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10412268).by Erika L. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, Rachel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission of Paolo C. Meireles Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10412258).by Erika L. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, Rachel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION for Admission of Gregg I. Shavitz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10412238).by Erika L. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, Rachel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Eighth Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (jpk) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Global Payments, Inc. and Total System Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Global Payments, Inc.) (jpk) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Erika L. Brown. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10384495) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join of Erika L. Brown, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Total System Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Global Payments Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Logan A. Pardell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Berlin Benjamin