This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2022 at 11:00:58 (UTC).

Brown v. The Allstate Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2022 Brown filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Allstate Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05096

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kiyo A. Matsumoto

Referral Judge

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colin Brown

Defendants

The Allstate Corporation

Allstate Insurance Company

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Allstate Indemnity Company

Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company

Allstate New Jersey Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Deerbrook Insurance Company

Encompass Holdings LLC

Encompass Insurance Company

Encompass Indemnity Company

Esurance Insurance Company

Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin P. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Marschhausen & Fitzpatrick, P.C.

73 Heitz Pl

Hicksville, NY 11801-3151

Defendant Attorney

Anupama Prasad

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

3 Wtc, 175 Greenwich Street, Ste 55Th Floor

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15883244 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by COLIN BROWN. (Fitzpatrick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by COLIN BROWN (Fitzpatrick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. by COLIN BROWN (Fitzpatrick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons. by Colin Brown (Fitzpatrick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Tavarez, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Anupama Prasad on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Prasad, Anupama) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint "Joint" by Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Deerbrook Insurance Company, Encompass Holdings LLC, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, The Allstate Corporation. (Prasad, Anupama) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #9 Motion for (collectively, "Allstate Defendants") Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint on or before 12/2/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/4/2022. (MV) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint "Joint" by Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company, Allstate New Jersey Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Deerbrook Insurance Company, Encompass Holdings LLC, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, The Allstate Corporation. (Prasad, Anupama) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Anupama Prasad on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Prasad, Anupama) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Tavarez, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. by Colin Brown (Fitzpatrick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketYour proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The CLERK OF COURT NAME needs to be updated/corrected.Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. by COLIN BROWN (Fitzpatrick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by COLIN BROWN (Fitzpatrick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15883244 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by COLIN BROWN. (Fitzpatrick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant