This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:49:02 (UTC).

Brown v. Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Brown filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sidney A Fitzwater. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02881

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Brown

Defendant

Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Malik Bowen

Attorney at Ben Abbott & Associates PLLC

1934 Pendleton Dr, 972-263-555

Garland, TX 75041

James Leonard Bauguss, III

Attorney at Ben Abbott & Associates, PLLC

1934 Pendleton Drive

Garland, TX 75041

Defendant Attorneys

Kelly Elizabeth Wise

Attorney at Fee, Smith, Sharp & Vitullo

13155 Noel Road, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75240

William Marcus Toles

Attorney at Fee Smith Sharp & Vitullo LLP

Three Galleria Tower, 13155 Noel Road, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75240

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Cover Sheet 260261

#9

(#9) Notice of Designation of Lead Counsel filed by Deborah Brown (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet 260261)Attorney James Leonard Bauguss, III added to party Deborah Brown(pty:pla) (Bauguss, James) Modified docket text on 1/16/2020 (cea). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#8

(#8) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/10/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/13/2020) (axm) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER: The court is advised by the clerk of court that Malik Bowen, Esquire, whose name appears on a pleading in this case, is not a member of the Bar of the Northern District of Texas. Within 28 days of the date of this order, Counsel shall either (1) provide to the court, and to the clerk of court, satisfactory documentation of membership or (2) apply for membership in the Bar of this court or for admission pro hac vice for this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/7/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#6

(#6) Amended Notice of Removal by Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Toles, William) Modified text on 1/7/2020 (ykp). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Defendant's notice of removal, filed December 5, 2019, appears to predicate subject matter jurisdiction upon diversity of citizenship, 28 U.S.C. 1332, but fails to allege properly the citizenship of plaintiff Deborah Brown ("Brown") and defendant Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP ("Sprouts"). The court has not specifically evaluated whether the notice of removal complies with N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 81.1. If Sprouts is satisfied that the notice of removal complies with Rule 81.1 and that additional documents are unnecessary to address the defect identified in this order, the amended notice of removal required by this order need not also contain the documents required by Rule 81.1. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/17/2019) (ndt) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sprouts Farmers Market Texas, LP. (Toles, William) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Defendant Sprouts Farmers Market Texas, LP. (Toles, William) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Index and State Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 68th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-19-16526 filed by Sprouts Farmers Market Texas, LP. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10457660) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index and State Court Pleadings) (Toles, William) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Designation of Lead Counsel filed by Deborah Brown (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet 260261)Attorney James Leonard Bauguss, III added to party Deborah Brown(pty:pla) (Bauguss, James) Modified docket text on 1/16/2020 (cea). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/10/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/13/2020) (axm) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: The court is advised by the clerk of court that Malik Bowen, Esquire, whose name appears on a pleading in this case, is not a member of the Bar of the Northern District of Texas. Within 28 days of the date of this order, Counsel shall either (1) provide to the court, and to the clerk of court, satisfactory documentation of membership or (2) apply for membership in the Bar of this court or for admission pro hac vice for this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/7/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended Notice of Removal by Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Toles, William) Modified text on 1/7/2020 (ykp). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Defendant's notice of removal, filed December 5, 2019, appears to predicate subject matter jurisdiction upon diversity of citizenship, 28 U.S.C. 1332, but fails to allege properly the citizenship of plaintiff Deborah Brown ("Brown") and defendant Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP ("Sprouts"). The court has not specifically evaluated whether the notice of removal complies with N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 81.1. If Sprouts is satisfied that the notice of removal complies with Rule 81.1 and that additional documents are unnecessary to address the defect identified in this order, the amended notice of removal required by this order need not also contain the documents required by Rule 81.1. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/17/2019) (ndt) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sprouts Farmers Market Texas, LP. (Toles, William) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Defendant Sprouts Farmers Market Texas, LP. (Toles, William) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 68th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-19-16526 filed by Sprouts Farmers Market Texas, LP. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10457660) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index and State Court Pleadings) (Toles, William) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.