This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:27:32 (UTC).

Brown v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Brown filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James H. Payne and Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00095

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James H. Payne

Referral Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Starla J. Brown

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy M. White

Attorney at AAA Disability Advocates, PC

7906 E 55Th St

Tulsa, OK 74145-7818

Defendant Attorney

Cheryl R. Triplett

Attorney at US Attorney (OKED)

520 Denison Ave

Muskogee, OK 74401

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Magistrate Judge's Availability with ORDER thereon by District Judge James H. Payne: denying consent (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : The Court orders Plaintiff to file a notarized IFP Motion and Affidavit no later than April 26, 2019. The completed IFP Motion must include required information. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice.(acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 3/27/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • (#14) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West, directing that the parties present their respective positions and legal authorities regarding the judicial review: Opening brief of Plaintiff due 8/30/19; response brief of Defendant due 60 days after opening brief of Plaintiff is filed. No extensions of time will be granted unless exceptional circumstances are provided to the Court. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within 11 days from the date the response brief of Defendant is filed. The case will be submitted to the Court for decision after the briefs are filed. Oral arguments before the Court will not be set herein unless requested within 60 days from this date. All motions to remand must state specifically whether it is a sentence 4 or sentence 6 remand. (Social Security Opening Brief due by 8/30/2019, Social Security Response Brief due by 10/29/2019, Social Security Reply Brief due by 11/12/2019)(acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Social Security Administration. (With attachments) (Triplett, Cheryl) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Magistrate Judge's Availability with ORDER thereon by District Judge James H. Payne: denying consent (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint re: Social Security Administration (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Starla J. Brown (White, Timothy) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration by serving Regional Counsel (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration by serving U.S. Attorney (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number 19-CV-95-JHP-KEW (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : Finding as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Starla J. Brown Responses due by 4/11/2019(White, Timothy) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : The Court orders Plaintiff to file a notarized IFP Motion and Affidavit no later than April 26, 2019. The completed IFP Motion must include required information. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice.(acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Starla J. Brown Responses due by 4/8/2019(White, Timothy) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 3/27/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Starla J. Brown (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Starla J. Brown (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.