This case was last updated from PACER on 06/26/2020 at 09:55:39 (UTC).

Brown v. RP On-Site, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 Brown filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against RP On-Site, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J Trenga and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00482

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J Trenga

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terry Brown

Defendant

RP On-Site, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Joseph Guzzo

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Kristi Cahoon Kelly

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Defendant Attorney

David Michael Gettings

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP (VA Beach)

222 Central Park Ave, Suite 2000

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting in part 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until July 13, 2020 to file its responsive pleading to the Complaint*. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 05/26/2020.*This is a three-week extension of the current date a responsive pleading is due (June 4, 2020) (wgar, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#7

(#7) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by RP On-Site, LLC. (Gettings, David) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Compliance by RP On-Site, LLC. RP On-Site, LLC served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020. (choy, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

4 #1

Notice to Attorney

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to RP On-Site, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, ) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Cahoon Kelly on behalf of Terry Brown (Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by Terry Brown. (Guzzo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7178440.), filed by RP On-Site, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Guzzo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting in part 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until July 13, 2020 to file its responsive pleading to the Complaint*. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 05/26/2020.*This is a three-week extension of the current date a responsive pleading is due (June 4, 2020) (wgar, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by RP On-Site, LLC. (Gettings, David) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Compliance by RP On-Site, LLC. RP On-Site, LLC served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020. (choy, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to RP On-Site, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, ) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Cahoon Kelly on behalf of Terry Brown (Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Terry Brown. (Guzzo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (choy, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7178440.), filed by RP On-Site, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Guzzo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RP On-Site LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristi Cahoon Kelly