Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2020 at 09:39:51 (UTC).

Brown v. Lofton Security Service, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Brown filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Lofton Security Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tom S. Lee and Robert P. Myers, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00614

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tom S. Lee

Referral Judge

Robert P. Myers, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alton Brown

Defendants

Lofton Security Service, Inc.

Derick Weeks

Matthew Bailey, Sr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis H. Watson, Jr.

Attorney at WATSON & NORRIS, PLLC

1880 Lakeland Drive, Suite G

Jackson, MS 39216

Robert Nicholas Norris

Attorney at WATSON & NORRIS, PLLC

1880 Lakeland Drive, Suite G

Jackson, MS 39216

Defendant Attorney

Hal D. Ungar

Attorney at OGLETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK & STEWART, P.C.- New Orleans

701 Poydras Street, Suite 3500

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Derick Weeks (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

7 #1

Attachment

#7

(#7) MOTION for Greg Guidry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4404163) by Matthew Bailey, Sr, Lofton Security Service, Inc., Derick Weeks (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

6 #1

Attachment

#6

(#6) MOTION for Andrew J. Halverson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4404122) by Matthew Bailey, Sr, Lofton Security Service, Inc., Derick Weeks (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) State Court Record by Defendant Lofton Security Service, Inc. (Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Nicholas Norris on behalf of Alton Brown (Norris, Robert) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lofton Security Service, Inc. (Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#2

(#2) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Lofton Security Service, Inc..(Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lofton Security Service, Inc. from First Judicial District of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CI1:20-cv-460-AHW. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4375511) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Defendant Derick Weeks' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Derick Weeks' Answer is now due by November 30, 2020. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on November 9, 2020. (JC) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8 : Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (cwl) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Derick Weeks (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Greg Guidry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4404163) by Matthew Bailey, Sr, Lofton Security Service, Inc., Derick Weeks (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Andrew J. Halverson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4404122) by Matthew Bailey, Sr, Lofton Security Service, Inc., Derick Weeks (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) State Court Record by Defendant Lofton Security Service, Inc. (Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Nicholas Norris on behalf of Alton Brown (Norris, Robert) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lofton Security Service, Inc. (Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Lofton Security Service, Inc..(Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lofton Security Service, Inc. from First Judicial District of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CI1:20-cv-460-AHW. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4375511) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lofton Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hal D Ungar