This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2021 at 09:56:32 (UTC).

Brown v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Brown filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-17577

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESQUIRE RICHARD BROWN

Defendants

& JOHNSON JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katrina Washington

Attorney at The Washington Firm, P.C.

6451 Camp Bowie Blvd.

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Natherral Jashont Washington

Attorney at The Washington Firm PC

6451 Camp Bowie Blvd

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Defendant Attorneys

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

Brittany Nicole Vanek

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002

Jennifer E Spencer

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

8 #8

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

8 #1

*Restricted*

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of & JOHNSON JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-01046. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -273): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2738, and that order has now been filed in the District of New Jersey. (npk) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Case document filed with Judicial Panel on MDL by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. (npk) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (npk) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (James, Scott) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (James, Scott) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Appendix in Support filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, (James, Scott) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Receipt #0539-12208349$ 402.00) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (James, Scott) Modified on 9/14/2021 (npk). (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brittany Nicole Vanek

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT A. JAMES