This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2020 at 08:53:01 (UTC).

Brown v. HESS CORPORATION Et. Al.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Brown filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HESS CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George W. Cannon, Jr and Wilma A. Lewis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00083

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

George W. Cannon, Jr

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clarence G. Brown

Defendants

HESS CORPORATION

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John-Russell Bart Pate

Attorney at J.R. Pate, PC - Law Office

P.O. Box 890, Royal Dane Mall 10-Aa

St. Thomas, VI 00804

Defendant Attorney

Carl A Beckstedt, III

Attorney at Beckstedt and Associate

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820-4604

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Closed-Stipulation pursuant to Rule 41. (EMK) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER (WAL) dated 11/25/2020. ORDER ACCEPTING #8 Stipulation of Dismissal which serves to DISMISS this action with each party to bear their own costs and fees; and it is further ORDERED that the other civil action pending between these parties is unaffected; and it is further ORDERED the Clerk is directed to mark this case CLOSED. (TLS) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Clarence G. Brown. (Nelson, Korey) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER (GWC) dated 10/23/2020 Initial Disclosures due by 11/13/2020., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/14/2020., Initial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp.. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendant Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by HESS CORPORATION. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendant HESS CORPORATION (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant HESS CORPORATION from Superior Court, case number SX-20-CV-682. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-891091)filed by HESS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HESS OIL VIRGIN ISLANDS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HESS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John-Russell Bart Pate