This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2021 at 10:22:52 (UTC).

Brown v. FEDEX FREIGHT INC et al

Case Summary

On July 13, 2021, Plaintiff Randolph Brown (“Plaintiff”), represented by John H. Peavy, Jr. of  Peavy Law LLC, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ronald Lynn Lipscomb (“Defendant Lipscomb”), FedEx Freight Inc. (“Defendant FedEx”), and Protective Insurance Company (“Defendant Protective”). Plaintiff seeks damages, as well as other relief, for the alleged negligence of the Defendants relating to a motor vehicle accident in which the Plaintiff was injured. This case was removed to U.S. District Court in the Middle District of Georgia with Judge Leslie A. Gardner presiding.

 

In his complaint, Plaintiff alleged that, “On or about the 9th day of May 2017, at approximately 5:14 PM, Plaintiff was traveling east in the right lane of GA 38. On the same date and same approximate time, Defendant Lipscomb was traveling east on GA 38, in the left lane, driving a semi-trailer, when he failed began to change lanes from the left to the right lane. Defendant changed lanes and the passenger side tires of his struck struck the driver’s side of the Plaintiff’s vehicle. As a result of this impact and Defendant Lipscomb driving his vehicle into the Plaintiff’s lane, Plaintiff’s vehicle was forced off of the road and his vehicle struck a curb, a sign support, and came to rest in some thick brush. As a result of Defendant Lipscomb’s negligence, Plaintiff suffered serious personal injuries and incurred medical expenses.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that, “Defendant Lipscomb was driving the motor carrier, owned by Defendant FEDEX, in the course of his employment and with the permission of Defendant FEDEX at the date and time of collision. Defendant FEDEX is liable to the Plaintiff, pursuant to the Respondeat Superior Doctrine.” Plaintiff also alleged that, “Plaintiff shows the cole and proximate cause of the collison, which occurred on May 9, 2021, was the negligence of Defendant Lipscomb, in the negligent operation of his motor vehicle.”

 

The claims for relief alleged by the Plaintiff are for Negligence on the part of each of the Defendants.

 

In his prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested that the Court grant judgement against the Defendants for medical bills, lost wages, and pain and suffering in the amount of $5,000,000.00 plus costs. Plaintiff also requested that the Court grant judgment against the Defendants for reasonable attorney’s fees and all costs of this action and such other and further relief as this Court may deem just and proper. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents. 

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00129

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randolph Brown

Defendants

FEDEX FREIGHT INC

RONALD LYNN LIPSCOMB

PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JOHN H PEAVY, JR

Attorney at PEAVY LAW LLC

1201 W Peachtree St Ste 2300

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Disclosure of PSI Notice Corporate Disclosure and Jurisdictional Statements

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Envelope Notice to Clerk and Notice to Plaintiff

1 #1

Exhibit Lowndes County Superior Court Pleading

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3842891, $402 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lowndes County Superior Court Pleading, #2 Envelope Notice to Clerk and Notice to Plaintiff, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Disclosure of PSI Notice Corporate Disclosure and Jurisdictional Statements)(PEAVY, JOHN) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer to Case # 7:21-cv-87. (mdm) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) This is a text only entry; no document issued.CASE TRANSFERRED TO VALDOSTA DIVISION Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 Statement. (mdm) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3842891, $402 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lowndes County Superior Court Pleading, #2 Envelope Notice to Clerk and Notice to Plaintiff, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Disclosure of PSI Notice Corporate Disclosure and Jurisdictional Statements)(PEAVY, JOHN) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FedEx Freight, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Hamilton Peavy, Jr.(Designation Retained)