This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 10:13:08 (UTC).

Brown v. Dunn et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Brown filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Dunn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly F. Pate and Myron H. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00440

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly F. Pate

Presiding Judge

Myron H. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Brown

Defendants

Patricia Jones

Jefferson S. Dunn

David Lamar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyle David Sawyer

Attorney at Attorney at Law

516 S. Perry Street; Suite 3-D

Montgomery, AL 36104

Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.

Attorney at McPhillips Shinbaum, L.L.P.

P O Box 64

Montgomery, AL 36101

Defendant Attorneys

Bart Gregory Harmon

Attorney at Alabama Department of Corrections

301 South Ripley Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Matthew Reeves

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale PC

655 Gallatin St

Huntsville, AL 35801

Stephen Clarence Rogers

Attorney at Maynard Cooper and Gale PC

655 Gallatin Street

Huntsville, AL 35801

William Richard Lunsford

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale PC

655 Gallatin Street

Huntsville, AL 35801

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

19 #1

Exhibit Letter listing witnesses

#19

#6

#5

4 #1

Standing Order and Sample Format

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Receipt

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Patricia Jones, David Lamar. (Harmon, Bart) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Patricia Jones, David Lamar. (Harmon, Bart) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Commissioner Dunn's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Commissioner Dunn's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Jefferson S. Dunn. (Reeves, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Dismiss Commissioner Dunn's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Jefferson S. Dunn. (Reeves, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Reeves on behalf of Jefferson S. Dunn (Reeves, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #19 Second MOTION to Expedite Discovery ot Incarceated Eye-Witnesses filed by Jefferson S. Dunn, Patricia Jones, David Lamar. (Rogers, Stephen) Modified on 8/23/2021 to add joint filers & clarify text (cwl, ). (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Amendment to re #19 Second MOTION to Expedite Discovery to Incarcerated Eye-Witnesses by Jennifer Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate social media post)(Sawyer, Kyle) Modified on 8/20/2021 clean up text (cwl, ). (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Clarence Rogers on behalf of Jefferson S. Dunn (Rogers, Stephen) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by William Richard Lunsford on behalf of Jefferson S. Dunn (Lunsford, William) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TEXT ORDER Setting Motion Hearing on #19 Second MOTION to Expedite Discovery to Incarcerated Eye-Witnesses before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson for 8/23/2021 at 8:00 AM by telephone. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/17/2021. (No pdf attached to this entry) (furn: calendar, ag)(cwl, ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT against Jefferson S. Dunn, Patricia Jones, David Lamar, filed by Jennifer Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Sawyer, Kyle) Modified on 7/8/2021 to remove against "All Defendants" and add them individually (cwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2021: #2 Exhibit Death Certificate REDACTED) (cwl, ). (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Brown. David Lamar served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (cwl, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Brown. Jefferson S. Dunn served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (cwl, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Brown. Patricia Jones served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. (cwl, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jennifer Brown re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Sawyer, Kyle) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jennifer Brown; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, ) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Jennifer Brown. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Jefferson S. Dunn, Patricia Jones, David Lamar and returned to counsel for service via process server. (bes, ) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jennifer Brown. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 for PDF) (bes, ) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jefferson S. Dunn, Patricia Jones, David Lamar ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602063755.), filed by Jennifer Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bes, ) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle David Sawyer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.