Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 08:15:01 (UTC).

BROWN v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 BROWN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02926

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL NEAL BROWN

Defendants

OFFICER PANARA

JOHN DOES

OFFICER WONG

OFFICER ZECHMAN

OFFICER HURST

OFFICER SULLIVAN

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

ZECHMAN

PANARA

JOHN DOE OFFICERS

HURST

SULLIVAN

WONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Keith McDaniel

Attorney at MCDANIEL LAW GROUP, PLLC

1920 L Street, Nw, Suite 303

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MICHAEL NEAL BROWN (McDaniel, Brian) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, OFFICER HURST, OFFICER PANARA, OFFICER SULLIVAN, OFFICER WONG, OFFICER ZECHMAN, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7705535) filed by MICHAEL NEAL BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit)(McDaniel, Brian) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MICHAEL NEAL BROWN (McDaniel, Brian) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, OFFICER HURST, OFFICER PANARA, OFFICER SULLIVAN, OFFICER WONG, OFFICER ZECHMAN, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7705535) filed by MICHAEL NEAL BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit)(McDaniel, Brian) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hurst AKA Mark M Hurst, Mark is a litigant

Latest cases where MD, WONG DR. is a litigant

Latest cases where SULLIVAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Keith McDaniel