This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:10:16 (UTC).

Brown v. Dawson CEO/Chief Financial Officer

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Brown filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Dawson CEO/Chief Financial Officer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark H. Cohen and John K. Larkins, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05631

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

Referral Judge

John K. Larkins, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

El Percy Alonzo Brown

East Point, GA 30344

Defendant

J. Cutler Dawson CEO/Chief Financial Officer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Leslie Kali Eason

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

Ernst & Young Building, 55 Ivan Allen Jr. Blvd. Nw

Atlanta, GA 30308

Burton Foster Peebles

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP-GA

Suite 1500, 3455 Peachtree Road Ne

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION to Strike #5 Amended Complaint, by J. Cutler Dawson CEO/Chief Financial Officer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eason, Leslie) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT filed by Percy Alonzo Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Strike #3 Complaint, by J. Cutler Dawson CEO/Chief Financial Officer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eason, Leslie) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to file an amended complaint clearly stating the legal and factual bases for his claim or claims by January 10, 2020. Plaintiff's amended complaint must comply with the pleading requirements in FRCivP 8 and 10. (See order for further details) Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 12/20/2019. (bdb) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) ORDER for Service of #8 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/6/2020. (dob) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against J. Cutler Dawson CEO/Chief Financial Officer filed by Percy Alonzo Brown.(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending #3 Complaint, filed by Percy Alonzo Brown, #5 Amended Complaint, filed by Percy Alonzo Brown be remanded to the State Court of Clayton County. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/6/2020. (dob) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Burton Foster Peebles on behalf of J. Cutler Dawson CEO/Chief Financial Officer (Peebles, Burton) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Percy Alonzo Brown re #9 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #8 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Complaint, filed by Percy Alonzo Brown, #5 Amended Complaint, filed by Percy Alonzo Brown. (dob) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER for Service of #8 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/6/2020. (dob) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending #4 MOTION to Strike #3 Complaint, filed by J. Cutler Dawson CEO/Chief Financial Officer be construed as a motion for remand and be granted, #6 MOTION to Strike #5 Amended Complaint, filed by J. Cutler Dawson CEO/Chief Financial Officer be denied as moot as found in #8 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/6/2020. (dob) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending #3 Complaint, filed by Percy Alonzo Brown, #5 Amended Complaint, filed by Percy Alonzo Brown be remanded to the State Court of Clayton County. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/6/2020. (dob) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Burton Foster Peebles on behalf of J. Cutler Dawson CEO/Chief Financial Officer (Peebles, Burton) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Strike #5 Amended Complaint, by J. Cutler Dawson CEO/Chief Financial Officer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eason, Leslie) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #4 MOTION to Strike #3 Complaint, , to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (dob) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (dob) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against J. Cutler Dawson CEO/Chief Financial Officer filed by Percy Alonzo Brown.(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Strike #3 Complaint, by J. Cutler Dawson CEO/Chief Financial Officer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eason, Leslie) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Percy Alonzo Brown re #2 Order. (bdb) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT filed by Percy Alonzo Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to file an amended complaint clearly stating the legal and factual bases for his claim or claims by January 10, 2020. Plaintiff's amended complaint must comply with the pleading requirements in FRCivP 8 and 10. (See order for further details) Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 12/20/2019. (bdb) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (ah) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by el, Percy Alonzo Brown. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.