This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2022 at 08:42:31 (UTC).

Brown v. Conagra Brands, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 Brown filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Conagra Brands, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John M. Gerrard and Cheryl R. Zwart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-03090

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John M. Gerrard

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Judy Brown

Defendant

Conagra Brands, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joy A. Shiffermiller

Attorney at SHIFFERMILLER LAW FIRM

1002 G Street

Lincoln, NE 68508

Defendant Attorneys

Brittany M. Falkowski

Attorney at HUSCH, BLACKWELL LAW FIRM - ST. LOUIS

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Marnie A. Jensen

Attorney at HUSCH, BLACKWELL LAW FIRM - OMAHA

13330 California Street, Suite 200

Omaha, NE 68154

Jennifer L. Ralph

Attorney at HUSCH, BLACKWELL LAW FIRM - CHICAGO

120 South Riverside Plaza, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

19 #5

Exhibit D

19 #4

Exhibit C

19 #3

Exhibit B

19 #2

Exhibit A

19 #1

Exhibit 1

19 #19

Main Document

#18

(#18) BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss Plaintff's Amended and Supplemental Complaint #17 by Attorney Jennifer L. Ralph on behalf of Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc..(Ralph, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintff's Amended and Supplemental Complaint by Attorney Jennifer L. Ralph on behalf of Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc..(Ralph, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#16

(#16) PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. 13), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (SLP) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#15

(#15) INITIAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The parties have stipulated to stay discovery pending a ruling on Defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss. The parties agree that Conagra Brands, Inc. shall file its motion to dismiss within the time period provided in Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). (See Filing No. 13). Within 14 days following the Court's ruling on Defendants forthcoming motion to dismiss, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed progression schedule to the undersigned magistrate judge. Plaintiff filed an amended complaint on June 17, 2022. Plaintiff does not anticipate a need to further amend her pleadings or add parties. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (SLP) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#13

(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Jennifer L. Ralph on behalf of Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc..(Ralph, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT supplemental Complaint against Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc., by Attorney Joy A. Shiffermiller on behalf of Judy Brown(Shiffermiller, Joy) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

10 #1

Proposed Amended Complaint

10 #10

Main Document

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) INDEX in support of MOTION to Dismiss Plaintff's Amended and Supplemental Complaint #17 by Attorney Jennifer L. Ralph on behalf of Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Ralph, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss Plaintff's Amended and Supplemental Complaint #17 by Attorney Jennifer L. Ralph on behalf of Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc..(Ralph, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintff's Amended and Supplemental Complaint by Attorney Jennifer L. Ralph on behalf of Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc..(Ralph, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. 13), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (SLP) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) INITIAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The parties have stipulated to stay discovery pending a ruling on Defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss. The parties agree that Conagra Brands, Inc. shall file its motion to dismiss within the time period provided in Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). (See Filing No. 13). Within 14 days following the Court's ruling on Defendants forthcoming motion to dismiss, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed progression schedule to the undersigned magistrate judge. Plaintiff filed an amended complaint on June 17, 2022. Plaintiff does not anticipate a need to further amend her pleadings or add parties. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (SLP) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JES) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Jennifer L. Ralph on behalf of Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc..(Ralph, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT supplemental Complaint against Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc., by Attorney Joy A. Shiffermiller on behalf of Judy Brown(Shiffermiller, Joy) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend. Plaintiff's proposed amended complaint, a copy of which was attached to Filing No. #10 , shall be filed separately of record on or before June 24, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Amend Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Attorney Joy A. Shiffermiller on behalf of Plaintiff Judy Brown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Shiffermiller, Joy) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #5 for attorney Brittany M. Falkowski. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER - CONSENT. Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 6/27/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Conagra Brands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Ralph, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4641254 by Attorney Brittany M. Falkowski on behalf of Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc..(Falkowski, Brittany) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docket(#4) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Jennifer L. Ralph on behalf of Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc. (Ralph, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jennifer L. Ralph on behalf of Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc..(Ralph, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Judy Brown from District Court of Lancaster County, NE, Case number CI-22-0001216 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4637997) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jennifer L. Ralph on behalf of Conagra Brands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Ralph, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conagra Foods Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brittany Falkowski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marnie Jensen