This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:19:26 (UTC).

Brown v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Brown filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark H. Cohen and Linda T. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05489

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

Referral Judge

Linda T. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timmy Brown

Defendant

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathleen Marie Flynn

Attorney at Law Offices of Kathleen M. Flynn

Suite 940, 315 West Ponce De Leon Ave.

Decatur, GA 30030

Kenneth R Hiller

Attorney at Law Offices of Kenneth Hiller, PLLC

Suite 1A, 6000 N. Bailey Avenue

Amherst, NY 14226

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 1/8/2020. (dob) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to US Attorney. (dob) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Regional Counsel. (dob) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Attorney General. (dob) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT filed by Timmy Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 1/8/2020. (dob) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth R. Hiller by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on January 8, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #2 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9219652). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Kenneth R Hiller added appearing on behalf of Timmy Brown (pmb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9219652). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Timmy Brown. (Flynn, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (ah) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timmy Brown. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Summons Proposed, #6 Summons Proposed, #7 Summons Proposed, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.